EP0693203 - IMPROVED DEVICE FOR SCANNING DATA MEDIA, PARTICULARLY GAME SLIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONALE DES JEUX 121 rue d'Aguesseau F-92643 Boulogne Billancourt Cédex / FR | [1996/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GATTO, Jean-Marie 7, rue Franqueville F-75006 Paris / FR | 02 /
BERTRAND, Dominique 6, rue Lacalille F-75017 Paris / FR | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Obolensky, Michel, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Obolensky, Michel, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95908989.7 | 06.02.1995 | [1996/04] | WO1995FR00141 | Priority number, date | FR19940001415 | 08.02.1994 Original published format: FR 9401415 | [1996/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9522120 | Date: | 17.08.1995 | [1995/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693203 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06K17/00 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
G06K17/0032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/04] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANALYSE VON INFORMATIONSTRÄGER, INSBESONDERE VON SPIELSCHEINEN | [1996/04] | English: | IMPROVED DEVICE FOR SCANNING DATA MEDIA, PARTICULARLY GAME SLIPS | [1996/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERFECTIONNE D'ANALYSE DE SUPPORTS D'INFORMATIONS, NOTAMMENT DE BULLETINS DE JEUX | [1996/04] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 18.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/24] | 08.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2661529 (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1,10 * page 1, line 8 - line 14 * * claims 1,11 *; | [A]FR2141130 (EASTMAN KODAK CO) [A] 1,4-6 * claim 1 *; | [A]FR2160447 (TRUE DATA CORP) [A] 2,3 * claims 4,9,13,15,26 * |