EP0779369 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING NON-ORIENTED ELECTROMAGNETIC STEEL PLATE HAVING HIGH MAGNETIC FLUX DENSITY AND LOW IRON LOSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMATA, R., Nippon Steel Corp. Tech. Dvpt. Bur. 20-1, Shintomi, Futtsu-shi Chiba 299-12 / JP | 02 /
KUBOTA, T., Nippon Steel Corp., Yawata Works 1-1, Tobihata-cho, Tobata-ku, Kitakyusyu-shi Fukuoka 804 / JP | 03 /
KUMANO, Tomoji, Nippon Steel Corp., Yawata Works 1-1, Tobihata-cho, Tobata-ku Kitakyusyu-shi, Fukuoka 804 / JP | [1997/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/25] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95909113.3 | 17.02.1995 | [1997/25] | WO1995JP00234 | Priority number, date | JP19940143181 | 24.06.1994 Original published format: JP 14318194 | [1997/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9600306 | Date: | 04.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0779369 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0779369 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.01.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/12 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
C21D8/1222 (EP,US);
C21D8/1261 (EP,US);
C21D8/1233 (EP,US);
C21D8/1277 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEN NICHT ORIENTIERTEN STAHLPLATTEN MIT HOHER MAGNETISCHER FLUSSDICHTE UND GERINGEM EISENVERLUST | [1999/33] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING NON-ORIENTED ELECTROMAGNETIC STEEL PLATE HAVING HIGH MAGNETIC FLUX DENSITY AND LOW IRON LOSS | [1997/25] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE TOLE D'ACIER ELECTRIQUE NON ORIENTEE PRESENTANT UNE DENSITE ELEVEE DE FLUX MAGNETIQUE ET UN NIVEAU FAIBLE DE PERTES EN FER | [1999/33] |
Former [1997/25] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ELEKTROMAGNETISCH NICHT ORIENTIERTEN STAHLPLATTEN MIT HOHER MAGNETISCHER FLUSSDICHTE UND GERINGEM EISENVERLUST | ||
Former [1997/25] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE TOLE D'ACIER ELECTROMAGNETIQUEMENT NON ORIENTEE PRESENTANT UNE DENSITE ELEVEE DE FLUX MAGNETIQUE POUR UN NIVEAU FAIBLE DE PERTE DANS LE NOYAU | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1996 | Translation filed | 17.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 17.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/25] | 17.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS58136718 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [A]JPH03193821 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [P]JPH06235026 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) |