EP0742891 - FLUID DISPENSING DEVICE WITH GRAVITY-FILL CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE DOSAGE SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUNIN, Leonid 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 95909255.2 | 13.01.1995 | [1996/47] | WO1995US00624 | Priority number, date | US19940182269 | 18.01.1994 Original published format: US 182269 | [1996/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9519551 | Date: | 20.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742891 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.07.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01F11/26 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
G01F11/262 (EP,US);
G01F11/268 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/47] | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICH EINSTELLBARE FLÜSSIGKEITSDOSIERVORRICHTUNG MIT SCHWERKRAFTNACHSCHUB | [1996/47] | English: | FLUID DISPENSING DEVICE WITH GRAVITY-FILL CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE DOSAGE SELECTION | [1996/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DISTRIBUTEUR DE FLUIDE AVEC UN SYSTEME DE DOSAGE VARIABLE EN CONTINU A REMPLISSAGE PAR GRAVITE | [1996/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1996 | Search fee paid | 19.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 21.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4143794 (STRATFORD MICHAEL G, et al) [DA] 1-5* the whole document *; | [DA]EP0232104 (REYMAN MARK E) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2413136 (ALBERT BURGER); | [A]US3006506 (GERMANO CHARLES E); | [A]US3045878 (BLANFORD WILLIAM F, et al); | [A]US4474312 (DONOGHUE ROBERT J [US]); | [Y]EP0335505 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [Y]US5165576 (HICKERSON FREDERICK R [US]); | [X]US5392966 (BUNIN LEONID [US]) |