EP0740597 - PRESSER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OETLINGER TOOL ENGINEERING CO., INC. 1058 Overland Court Grafton, WI 53024 / US | [1996/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OETLINGER, Frank, E. 1433 Fox Lane Grafton, WI 53024 / US | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 95909270.1 | 18.01.1995 | [1996/45] | WO1995US00732 | Priority number, date | US19940183991 | 18.01.1994 Original published format: US 183991 | US19940303010 | 08.09.1994 Original published format: US 303010 | [1996/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9519246 | Date: | 20.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740597 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740597 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/02, B26D7/18 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
B26D7/1818 (EP,US);
B26D7/02 (EP,US);
B26D7/025 (EP,US);
B26D2007/1881 (EP,US);
Y10T225/321 (EP,US);
Y10T225/371 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/45] | Title | German: | NIEDERHALTERANORDNUNG | [1996/45] | English: | PRESSER ASSEMBLY | [1996/45] | French: | ENSEMBLE PRESSEUR | [1996/45] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 17.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US1404239 (CHARLES SEYBOLD) [X] 1-7,11-16,21-24,28,29 * the whole document * [Y] 25,26,30,32,35; | [Y]US1911742 (BERRY) [Y] 30 * page 2, line 63 - line 67; figure 4 *; | [Y]US2413999 (SHANER LYLE E) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 49 - line 63; figures 3,4 *; | [X]DE2022951 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG) [X] 11 * page 6, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [Y]CH593131 (SCHROETER FRIEDRICH) [Y] 25,26 * figure 4 *; | [XY]DE2825631 (KHU PETER) [X] 11 * page 8, line 5 - page 12, line 8 * [Y] 32; | [X]DE3033648 (SCHOEN & CIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,11,12 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0391299 (BOBST SA [CH]) [Y] 35 * column 3, line 23 - line 27; figure .; claim 1 *[A] 36; | [Y]FR2682633 (VAUTIER JEAN CLAUDE [FR], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * |