EP0742896 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NONINVASIVE PREDICTION OF HEMATOCRIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Cardiovascular Systems Corporation 2101 Cottontail Lane Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | [2000/16] |
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARIM, Hatim, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
KNUDSON, Orlin, B. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
EKHOLM, Bruce, P. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
ERICKSON, David, P. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
KELLIHER, William, J., Jr. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
RUDE, Michael, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
SMITH, Dirk, R. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95909302.2 | 19.01.1995 | [1996/47] | WO1995US00888 | Priority number, date | US19940189600 | 31.01.1994 Original published format: US 189600 | [1996/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520757 | Date: | 03.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742896 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742896 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/31, A61B5/00 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
A61B5/14552 (EP,US);
A61B5/14535 (EP,US);
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B5/6843 (EP,US);
A61B5/7228 (EP,US);
G01N21/314 (EP,US);
G01N21/359 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0233 (EP,US);
A61B2562/046 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR NICHTINVASIVEN VORHERSAGE VON HÄMATOKRIT | [1996/47] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NONINVASIVE PREDICTION OF HEMATOCRIT | [1996/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PREDICTION NON SANGLANTE D'HEMATOCRITE | [1996/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 25.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0404562 (UNIV NEW MEXICO [US], et al); | [AD]EP0419223 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al); | [A]EP0476192 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]); | [A]US5101825 (GRAVENSTEIN DIETRICH [US], et al); | [A]WO9213482 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]WO9313706 (US HEALTH [US]) |