EP0693121 - MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY 88BV59, SUBCLONES AND METHOD OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PerImmune Holdings, Inc. 1330 Piccard Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [1999/29] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states AKZO NOBEL N.V. Velperweg 76, Postbus 186 NL-6800 LS Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNA, Michael G. 113 Fairview Avenue Frederick, MD 21701 / US | 02 /
HASPEL, Martin V. 14029 Berryville Road Seneca, MD 20874 / US | 03 /
HOOVER, Herbert C. 123 Summer Street Hingham, MA 20243 / US | 04 /
FRALEY, Marie Elena A. 6081 Flagstone Court Frederick, MD 21701 / US | 05 /
KOBRIN, Barry J. 710 Horton Drive Silver Spring, MD 20902 / US | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1996/04] | Hermans, Franciscus G.M., et al P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 95909472.3 | 03.02.1995 | [1996/04] | WO1995US01440 | Priority number, date | US19940192089 | 04.02.1994 Original published format: US 192089 | [1996/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9521244 | Date: | 10.08.1995 | [1995/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693121 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.08.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/10, C07K16/18, C07K16/30 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (KR);
C07K16/30 (EP);
C12N5/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/04] | Title | German: | MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER 88BV59, SUBKLONE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1996/04] | English: | MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY 88BV59, SUBCLONES AND METHOD OF MAKING | [1996/04] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL 88BV59, SUBCLONES ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1996/04] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1995 | Search fee paid | 07.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 28.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/42] | 05.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/42] | Request for further processing for: | 25.07.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 25.07.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.08.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2000 | 28.02.2002 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 23.10.1998 | ID: | 02 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 23.10.1998 | [1999/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9119797 (UNIV NEW YORK [US]) [X] 5 * page 7, lines 13-26 * | [X] - GLASKY M S ET AL, "STABILITY OF SPECIFIC IMMUNOGLOBIN SECRETION BY EBV-TRANSFORMED LYMPHOBLASTOID CELLS AND HUMAN-MURINE HETEROHYBRIDOMAS", HYBRIDOMA, (19890801), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 377 - 389, XP000673899 [X] 5 * abstract * * page 379, paragraph 3 * * Discussion * | International search | [Y]EP0488470 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [Y]US4828991 (HANNA JR MICHAEL [US], et al) | [Y] - TIPS, Volume 14, issued May 1993, G. WINTER et al., "Antibody-based Therapy", pages 139-143, see entire document. | [Y] - Proceedings of the American Association for Cancer Research, Volume 32, issued March 1991, MURRAY et al., "Tissue Reactivity of a Human IgG Monoclonal Antibody Derived from a Patient Immunized with Autologous Colon Carcinoma Cells", page 261, column 2, Abstract No. 1553, see entire Abstract. |