EP0748213 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR PULMONARY DELIVERY OF INSULIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Revocation of patent | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nektar Therapeutics 201 Industrial Road San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | [2007/52] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Nektar Therapeutics 150 Industrial Road San Carlos, CA 94070-6256 / US | ||
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states INHALE THERAPEUTIC SYSTEMS 1001 East Meadow Circle Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATTON, John S. 330 Emerald Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 02 /
FOSTER, Linda C. 733 Carolina Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94070 / US | 03 /
PLATZ, Robert M. 324 Valdez Avenue Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al Boult, Wade & Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95909506.8 | 07.02.1995 | [1996/51] | WO1995US01563 | Priority number, date | US19940207472 | 07.03.1994 Original published format: US 207472 | US19950383475 | 01.02.1995 Original published format: US 383475 | [1996/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9524183 | Date: | 14.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748213 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0748213 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.09.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/12, A61K38/28, A61K9/72 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
A61K9/0075 (EP,US);
A61K9/12 (KR);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61K9/1623 (EP,US);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/51] | A61K9/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MITTEL ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON INSULIN ÜBER DIE LUNGE | [1996/51] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR PULMONARY DELIVERY OF INSULIN | [1996/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET PREPARATIONS POUR L'ADMINISTRATION D'INSULINE PAR VOIE PULMONAIRE | [1996/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.1996 | Search fee paid | 03.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 16.08.2000 | Observations by third parties | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04076082.9 / EP1462096 | EP08021259.0 / EP2036541 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis IN 46285 / US Opponent's representative Hiscock, Ian James Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | 02
14.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE Vectura Limited 1 Prospect West Chippenham, Wiltshire SN14 6FH / GB Opponent's representative Gill, Siân Victoria Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | 03
13.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE Quadrant Drug Delivery Limited 1 Mere Way, Ruddington Nottingham, NG11 6JS / GB Opponent's representative Stevens, Ian Edward Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | 04
14.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE Advanced Inhalation Research Inc 88 Sidney Street Cambrige Massachusetts 02139 / US Opponent's representative Chapman, Paul William Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE Eli Lilly and Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis Indiana, 46285 / US Opponent's representative Hiscock, Ian James Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
02
14.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE Vectura Limited 1 Prospect West Chippenham Wiltshire SN14 6FH / GB Opponent's representative Gill, Siân Victoria Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | |||
03
13.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE Quadrant Drug Delivery Limited 1 Mere Way, Ruddington Nottingham, NG11 6JS / GB Opponent's representative Stevens, Ian Edward Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | |||
04
14.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE Advanced Inhalation Research Inc 88 Sidney Street Cambrige Massachusetts 02139 / US Opponent's representative Chapman, Paul William Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | 18.02.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.10.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.07.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/35] | Appeal following opposition | 20.07.2007 | Appeal received No. T1175/07 | 01.10.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.07.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3937668 (ZOLLE ILSE) [X] 8,9,11,12 * column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 6 * [Y] 1-7; | [X]WO8400294 (SCHROEDER ULF) [X] 8,9,12 * page 8, line 17 - line 21 * * page 10; example 13 * * claim 8 *; | [XY]EP0302772 (TOYO JOZO KK [JP]) [X] 8-12 * page 2, line 6 - line 7 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, column 17 * * page 7; examples 13A,C * [Y] 6,7; | [A]US4806343 (CARPENTER JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 10 * column 3, line 65 - line 68 * * column 9, line 13 - line 15 *; | [X]WO9106282 (DANBIOSYST UK [GB]) [X] 8,9,12 * page 22 - page 23 * * claims 1,3,10 *; | [DY]WO9300951 (INHALE INC [US]) [DY] 1-5* claim 1 *; | WO9325198 [ ] (TEIJIN LTD [JP], et al); | [PXY]EP0611567 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [PX] 8-10,12 * page 2, line 1 - line 13 * * page 7, line 34 * * page 7, line 45 - page 8, line 46 * [PY] 6,7; | [PX]WO9500127 (ASTRA AB [SE]) [PX] 8-10,12 * page 2, line 23 - page 5, line 4 * * page 13, line 7 - line 22 * * page 14, line 13 - line 23 *; | [E]EP0655237 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [E] 8,10,12 * column 4, line 4 - line 47 * * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 33 * * column 7; example 4 * | International search | [Y]US5017372 (HASTINGS DONALD H [US]); | [X]US5204108 (ILLUM LISBETH [GB]) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, Volume 1, 1984, (NAGAI), "Powder Dosage Form of Insulin for Nasal Administration", pages 15-22. | other | - KÖHLER D, "Aerosols for Systematic Treatment", LUNG, (1990), pages 677 - 684, XP000945464 |