EP0745116 - HYDROGENATION OF UNSATURATED FATS, FATTY ACIDS OR FATTY ACID ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TACKE, Thomas Hardtwaldallee 12 D-61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | 02 /
WIELAND, Stefan Starkenburgring 27 D-63069 Offenbach / DE | 03 /
PANSTER, Peter Im Lochseif 8 D-63517 Rodenbach / DE | 04 /
BANKMANN, Martin Lindenstrasse 16 D-63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 05 /
BRAND, Reinhold Heinrich-Vingerhut-Weg 4 D-63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 06 /
MÄGERLEIN, Hendrik Am Eichbühel 28 D-61476 Kronberg / DE | [1996/49] | Application number, filing date | 95909690.0 | 09.02.1995 | [1996/49] | WO1995EP00456 | Priority number, date | DE19944405029 | 17.02.1994 Original published format: DE 4405029 | [1996/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9522591 | Date: | 24.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745116 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745116 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C11C3/12 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
C11C3/126 (EP);
B01J3/008 (EP);
C07C51/36 (EP);
C07C67/303 (EP);
Y02P20/54 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/303, C07C69/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/49] | Title | German: | HÄRTEN VON UNGESÄTTIGTEN FETTEN, FETTSÄUREN ODER FETTSÄUREESTERN | [1996/49] | English: | HYDROGENATION OF UNSATURATED FATS, FATTY ACIDS OR FATTY ACID ESTERS | [1996/49] | French: | HYDROGENATION DE GRAISSES, D'ACIDES GRAS OU D'ESTERS D'ACIDES GRAS INSATURES | [1996/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 25.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.1999
30.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE Harröd, Magnus, et.al. Ekasavägen 4 44165 Alingsas / SE Opponent's representative Egeröd, Lisbeth Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.1999
30.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE Harröd, Magnus, et.al. Ekasavägen 4 44165 Alingsas / SE Opponent's representative Egeröd, Lisbeth Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | ||
Former [1999/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.1999
Magnus Härröd Ekasvägen 4 441 65 Alingsas / SE Opponent's representative Egeröd, Lisbeth Göteborgs Patentbyra Dahls AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | 29.09.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.03.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.01.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.02.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.10.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/16] | Appeal following opposition | 24.04.2001 | Appeal received No. T0461/01 | 30.06.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.10.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 26.10.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2004 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.02.2003 | BE | 28.02.2003 | CH | 28.02.2003 | LI | 28.02.2003 | PT | 31.08.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/28] | BE | 28.02.2003 | |
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
PT | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 28.02.2003 | |
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
PT | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 28.02.2003 | |
LI | 28.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1481958 (COAL IND) [A] 1 * page 1, line 42 - line 85 ** claim 1 *; | [PA]WO9406738 (UNICHEMA CHEMIE BV [NL], et al) [PA] 1,3,4 * page 4, line 23 - line 29 * * page 5, line 19 - line 25 * * claims 1,2,5,6,13 * | [A] - N.G. KRUPENYA ET AL., "Selectivity of the hydrogenation of cottonseed oil in saturated hydrocarbons, on a stationary catalyzer", FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANFURT/MAIN, DE [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - IZVESTIYA VYSSHIKH UCHEBNYKH ZAVEDENII, PISHCHEVAYA TEKHNOLOGIYA, no. 3, pages 67 - 69 |