EP0695427 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EVALUATING THE PERMEABILITY OF A ROCK MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DE GEOPHYSIQUE 1, rue Léon Migaux 91341 Massy Cedex / FR | For all designated states Pozzi, Jean-Pierre 6 Allée des Tilleuls F-92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DE GEOPHYSIQUE 1, Rue Léon Migaux F-91341 Massy Cédex / FR | ||
For all designated states Pozzi, Jean-Pierre 6 Allée des Tilleuls F-92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POZZI, Jean-Pierre 6, allée des Tilleuls F-92190 Meudon / FR | 02 /
MARTIN, Jean-Pierre 87, rue Sartoris 92250 La Garenne-Colombes / FR | [1996/06] | Representative(s) | Flavenot, Bernard Société ABRITT 17, rue du Docteur Charcot La Norville 91290 Arpajon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | Flavenot, Bernard Société ABRITT 17, rue du Docteur Charcot La Norville F-91290 Arpajon / FR | Application number, filing date | 95909840.1 | 17.02.1995 | [1996/06] | WO1995FR00188 | Priority number, date | FR19940001965 | 22.02.1994 Original published format: FR 9401965 | [1996/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9522809 | Date: | 24.08.1995 | [1995/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0695427 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/26, G01N15/08 | [1996/06] | CPC: |
G01N15/082 (EP,US);
G01V3/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER PERMEABILITÄT EINES GESTEINS | [1996/06] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EVALUATING THE PERMEABILITY OF A ROCK MEDIUM | [1996/06] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'EVALUER LA PERMEABILITE D'UN MILIEU ROCHEUX | [1996/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/06] | 24.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/44] | 12.06.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0043768 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [D]US4427944 (CHANDLER RICHARD N [US]); | [Y]US4437064 (OVERTON JR WILLIAM C [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,9,12 * column 1, line 34 - line 36 * * column 6, line 31 - line 36 *; | [A]FR2540253 (PETROLES CIE FRANCAISE [FR]) [A] 3,5 * claims 1,2 *; | [Y]US5209104 (COLLINS SAMUEL H [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,9,12 * abstract *; | [A]US5269180 (DAVE YOGESH S [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |