EP0752929 - FABRIC LAMINATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark Delaware 19714-9206 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, Delaware 19714-9206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Huey, Shen 25 Harris Circle Newark, DE 19711 / US | [1997/03] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95910139.5 | 26.01.1995 | [1997/03] | WO1995US01170 | Priority number, date | US19940220133 | 30.03.1994 Original published format: US 220133 | US19940289165 | 11.08.1994 Original published format: US 289165 | US19940358423 | 19.12.1994 Original published format: US 358423 | [1997/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9526881 | Date: | 12.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752929 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752929 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/12, D06N3/04, D06M15/227 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B01D39/083 (EP,US);
B01D39/1692 (EP,US);
B01D67/0088 (EP,US);
B32B27/322 (US);
C08F20/22 (EP,US);
C09D133/16 (EP,US);
D06M15/277 (EP,US);
D06M15/295 (EP,US);
D06M15/3562 (EP,US);
D06M15/576 (EP,US);
D06M23/08 (EP,US);
D06N3/047 (EP,US);
A41D31/00 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0414 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0471 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0618 (EP,US);
B01D2239/065 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0681 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1241 (EP,US);
B32B2305/026 (US);
B32B2327/18 (US);
D06N2205/023 (EP,US);
D06N2205/20 (EP,US);
D06N2209/123 (EP,US);
D06N2209/142 (EP,US);
D06N2209/145 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/03] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE STOFFBAHNEN | [1997/03] | English: | FABRIC LAMINATES | [1997/03] | French: | STRATIFIES EN TISSU | [1997/03] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/03] | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9221715 (DONALDSON CO INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,10,11 * claims 41,42 * * page 6, line 17 - page 9, line 32 *; | [YA]US3940359 (CHAMBERS WILLIAM JOHN) [Y] 1,2,10,11 * column 1, line 45 - column 3, line 28; claims 1,7 * [A] 3,6,8,9,15,17,18; | [A]EP0414155 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6 * page 2, line 24 - line 29 * * page 6, line 12 - line 52 * * page 7, line 57 - page 8, line 7 *; | [A]JPH04272988 ; | [A]JPH05214198 ; | [A]EP0572269 (HOECHST GOSEI KK [JP]) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 45, Database accession no. 92-370610, & JPH04272988 A 19920929 (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 38, Database accession no. 93-299773, & JPH05214198 A 19930824 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM. KK.) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | Examination | - DATABASE WPI Week 9245, Derwent Publications Ltd., LondonGB; AN 92-370610 & | - JP,A,4 272 988 (ASAHI GLASS CO.LTD.) 29 September 1992 |