EP0745270 - COMPLIANT ELECTRICALLY CONNECTIVE BUMPS FOR AN ADHESIVE FLIP CHIP INTEGRATED CIRCUIT DEVICE AND METHODS FOR FORMING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROELECTRONICS AND COMPUTER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3500 West Balcones Center Drive Austin, TX 78759-5398 / US | [1996/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLAN, Ernest, R. 1204 Robin Trail Round Rock, TX 78681 / US | 02 /
DUANE, Diana, Carter 2503 Wildlife Run Cedar Park, TX 78613 / US | 03 /
HERDER, Todd, H. 3021 NW Angelica Drive Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | 04 /
BISHOP, Thomas, A. 7444 Dallas Drive Austin, TX 78729 / US | 05 /
TRAN, Kimcuc, T. 2308 Cedar Branch Drive Austin, TX 78750 / US | 06 /
FROEHLICH, Robert, W. 9005 Middlebie Drive Austin, TX 78750 / US | 07 /
GERMAN, Randy, L. 8913 Sharpstone Austin, TX 78717 / US | 08 /
NELSON, Richard, D. 1500 Cliffside Drive Austin, TX 78704 / US | 09 /
LEE, Chung, J. 7908 Brightman Lane Austin, TX 78733 / US | 10 /
BREEN, Mark, R. 1602 Garner Avenue Austin, TX 78704 / US | 11 /
KESWICK, Kathryn, V. 1807 Collier Street Austin, TX 78704 / US | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95910308.6 | 13.02.1995 | [1996/49] | WO1995US02109 | Priority number, date | US19940195434 | 14.02.1994 Original published format: US 195434 | [1996/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9522172 | Date: | 17.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745270 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.08.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/44, H01L21/441, H01L21/60 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
H01L24/12 (EP,US);
H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H01L23/49811 (EP,US);
H01L24/03 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (EP,US);
H01L24/11 (EP,US);
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0231 (EP,US);
H01L2224/03912 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05554 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0603 (EP,US);
H01L2224/114 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/116 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11902 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1319 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85444 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01022 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01028 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0103 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01056 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01327 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1996/49] | H01L21/44, H01L21/441 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/49] | Title | German: | WEICHE ELEKTRISCHE VERBINDUNGSHÖCKER FÜR EINEN GEKLEBTEN KOPF-ÜBER-IC UND SEINEHERSTELLUNG | [1996/49] | English: | COMPLIANT ELECTRICALLY CONNECTIVE BUMPS FOR AN ADHESIVE FLIP CHIP INTEGRATED CIRCUIT DEVICE AND METHODS FOR FORMING SAME | [1996/49] | French: | BOSSES DE RACCORDEMENT ELECTRIQUE SOUPLES DESTINEES A UN DISPOSITIF A CIRCUIT INTEGRE A PUCES A BOSSES ADHESIVES ET LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION | [1996/49] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.1996 | Search fee paid | 10.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 01.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/15] | 06.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH03101234 ; | [XY]EP0295914 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 5, line 16 - column 9, line 23; figures 1-3 * [Y] 10; | [X]JPH05243231 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,5,7; | US5477087 [ ] (KAWAKITA TETSUO [JP], et al) [ ] * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 51 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 45; figures 1,2,5 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910722), vol. 015, no. 288, Database accession no. (E - 1092), & JP03101234 A 19910426 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,4,8 * abstract * [Y] 10 | International search | [X]US4740700 (SHAHAM YIFAL J [US], et al); | [A]US5071787 (MORI MIKI [JP], et al); | [A]US5189502 (GOMI HIDEKI [JP]); | [A]US5208186 (MATHEW RANJAN J [US]); | [A]US5223454 (UDA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US5284797 (HEIM DOROTHY A [US]); | [AP]US5290732 (KUMAR NALIN [US], et al) | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1993 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICROELECTRONICS, 9-11 November 1993, Dallas, Texas, J. SIMON et al., "Electroless Bumping for TAB and Flip Chip", pages 439-444. |