EP0693929 - METHOD FOR PREVENTING KERATOCYTE LOSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA University Park Los Angeles California 90089 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA University Park Los Angeles, California 90089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McDONNELL, Peter John 3841 Keswick Road La Canada-Flintridge, CA 91011 / US | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1996/05] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing. Weiss Patentanwälte Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 95910916.6 | 03.02.1995 | [1996/05] | WO1995US01430 | Priority number, date | US19940191830 | 04.02.1994 Original published format: US 191830 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520969 | Date: | 10.08.1995 | [1995/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693929 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.08.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/74, A61K9/00 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
A61L15/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A61K31/765 (EP,US);
A61K31/77 (EP,US);
A61K31/79 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/05] | A61K31/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBEUGUNG VON KERATOZYTENVERLUST | [1996/05] | English: | METHOD FOR PREVENTING KERATOCYTE LOSS | [1996/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREVENTION DE LA PERTE DE KERATOCYTES | [1996/05] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1995 | Search fee paid | 03.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 29.10.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/09] | 29.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0323522 (SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [X]US4886786 (LINDSTROM RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5103840 (KAVOUSSI HAROLD P [US]); | [A]US5143731 (VIEGAS TACEY X [US], et al); | [A]US5242902 (MURPHY CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al); | [A]US5277911 (VIEGAS TACEY X [US], et al) | International search | [XY]US4443432 (GARABEDIAN MICHAEL E [US], et al); | [XPY]US5380537 (ANDERMANN GUY [FR]) | by applicant | US4443432 | US4695536 | US5104787 |