EP0801843 - SERVO MOTOR CONTROLLER USING POSITION INTERPOLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IOMEGA CORPORATION 1821 West 4000 South Roy, UT 84067 / US | [1997/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RABIN, Steve Box 232440, 3223 Greyling Drive San Diego, CA 92193-2440 / US | 02 /
HANSON, Kirk, D. 14852 Heather Glen San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 03 /
PERONA, Mark, W. 9385 Black Hills Way San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Boyce, Conor, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | Boyce, Conor, et al c/o F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 95911103.0 | 27.02.1995 | [1997/43] | WO1995US02339 | Priority number, date | US19940205840 | 03.03.1994 Original published format: US 205840 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9524071 | Date: | 08.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801843 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.09.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/04, H02P6/16 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
H02P6/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/43] | Title | German: | SERVO-MOTOR REGLER MIT POSITIONSINTERPOLATION | [1997/43] | English: | SERVO MOTOR CONTROLLER USING POSITION INTERPOLATION | [1997/43] | French: | CONTROLEUR DE SERVOMOTEUR FONCTIONNANT PAR INTERPOLATION DES POSITIONS | [1997/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.1996 | Search fee paid | 04.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.09.1996 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/41] | 29.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/41] | Request for further processing for: | 15.12.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0301366 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9,11 * the whole document * [Y] 13; | [YA]DE4009258 (BRASIL COMPRESSORES SA [BR]) [Y] 13 * the whole document * [A] 1-12; | [A]WO9323911 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,9,11 * abstract * | [A] - BABICO J, "3-PHASE BRUSHLESS DC MOTOR USING A SINGLE SENSOR", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS, (198908), vol. 9, page 56/57, XP000053786 [A] 1,9,11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4622499 (SQUIRES JOHN P [US], et al); | [A]US4818908 (TAMAE HIROAKI [JP], et al) |