EP0746429 - ROLL FORMING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRANER USA, INC. 9301 W. Bernice Street Schiller Park, IL 60176 / US | [1996/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOVINGGOOD, Steve 24097 Forsyte Street Moreno Valley, CA 92557 / US | 02 /
SCHAEFFER, George 141 S. Western Coil Road Lindon, UT 84042 / US | 03 /
MATSUNAGA, Douglas, S. 25880 St. Mary's Road Mettawa, IL 60048 / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Boyce, Conor, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Boyce, Conor, et al c/o F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 95911112.1 | 24.02.1995 | [1996/50] | WO1995US02368 | Priority number, date | US19940201787 | 25.02.1994 Original published format: US 201787 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9523043 | Date: | 31.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0746429 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/12 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
B21D5/12 (EP,KR,US);
B21B31/10 (EP,US);
B21B2031/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/50] | Title | German: | PROFILWALZENEINRICHTUNG | [1996/50] | English: | ROLL FORMING MACHINE | [1996/50] | French: | MACHINE DE PROFILAGE A ROULEAUX | [1996/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 16.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 26.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/14] | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3901060 (CORRADINI REMO) [X] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2144886 (OLIVER MACHINERY CO) [A] 1; | [DA]US3727503 (BRANER H, et al) [DA] 1 |