EP0750712 - Use of a security apparatus as an access lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/01] | ACCESS LOCK | ||
[1999/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIESHOFF, Jürgen Kollwitzweg 15 64291 Darmstadt / DE | [1997/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Katscher, Helmut Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Dolivostrasse 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | Katscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Fröbelweg 1 64291 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 95911295.4 | 04.03.1995 | [1997/01] | WO1995EP00808 | Priority number, date | DE19940004326U | 15.03.1994 Original published format: DE 9404326 U | [1997/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9525215 | Date: | 21.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750712 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750712 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E05B73/00, E05B67/36 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
E05B67/36 (EP);
E05B73/0005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1997/01] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer Sicherungseinrichtung als Zugangs-Verriegelung | [1999/04] | English: | Use of a security apparatus as an access lock | [1999/04] | French: | Utilisation d'un dispositif de securité comme dispositif de verrouillage d'accès | [1999/04] |
Former [1997/01] | ZUGANGS-VERRIEGELUNG | ||
Former [1997/01] | ACCESS LOCK | ||
Former [1997/01] | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE D'ACCES | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 09.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.1997 | 31.03.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.12.1999 | GB | 22.12.1999 | NL | 22.12.1999 | SE | 22.12.1999 | DK | 22.03.2000 | BE | 31.03.2000 | CH | 31.03.2000 | LI | 31.03.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/45] | GB | 22.12.1999 | |
NL | 22.12.1999 | ||
SE | 22.12.1999 | ||
DK | 22.03.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
CH | 31.03.2000 | ||
LI | 31.03.2000 | ||
FR | 19.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GB | 22.12.1999 | |
NL | 22.12.1999 | ||
SE | 22.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
CH | 31.03.2000 | ||
LI | 31.03.2000 | ||
FR | 19.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | GB | 22.12.1999 | |
SE | 22.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
CH | 31.03.2000 | ||
LI | 31.03.2000 | ||
FR | 19.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | GB | 22.12.1999 | |
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
CH | 31.03.2000 | ||
LI | 31.03.2000 | ||
FR | 19.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | GB | 22.12.1999 | |
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
FR | 19.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | GB | 22.12.1999 | |
FR | 19.05.2000 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4856305 (ADAMS MICHAEL W [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 56; figure - * [Y] 5; | [XA]US4696449 (WOO KENNETH [CA], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 16 - line 27 * * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 23; figure - * [A] 4; | [YA]US5076079 (MONOSON DAVID B [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, paragraph 2 * * column 2, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 * * column 4, line 16 - line 66 * * column 6, line 4 - line 25 * * column 6, line 66 - column 8, line 17 * * column 9, line 18 - line 53; figure - * [A] 1-4; | [A]US3859826 (SINGER M LEONARD, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 54; figure - * |