EP0804686 - PISTON PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [1999/05] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOLZ, Peter In den Wingerten 14 D-64291 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
KAISER, Ralf Dyckerhoffstrasse 5 D-65203 Mainz-Amöneburg / DE | 03 /
ZAVISKA, Dalibor Bremer Strasse 17 D-65760 Eschborn / DE | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1999/05] |
Former [1997/45] | Portwich, Peter c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 95911325.9 | 11.03.1995 | [1997/45] | WO1995EP00911 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9628661 | Date: | 19.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804686 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0804686 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F04B53/16, F04B1/04 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
F04B53/168 (EP);
B60T8/4031 (EP);
F04B1/0421 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | KOLBENPUMPE | [1997/45] | English: | PISTON PUMP | [1997/45] | French: | POMPE A PISTON | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 01.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.01.1997 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | 23.01.1997 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   03.03.1997 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 15.10.2003 | IE | 15.10.2003 | NL | 15.10.2003 | DK | 15.01.2004 | GR | 15.01.2004 | SE | 15.01.2004 | ES | 26.01.2004 | AT | 11.03.2004 | LU | 11.03.2004 | PT | 15.03.2004 | BE | 31.03.2004 | CH | 31.03.2004 | LI | 31.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/51] | GB | 15.10.2003 | |
IE | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
ES | 26.01.2004 | ||
AT | 11.03.2004 | ||
LU | 11.03.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | GB | 15.10.2003 | |
IE | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
ES | 26.01.2004 | ||
LU | 11.03.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | GB | 15.10.2003 | |
IE | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
ES | 26.01.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | GB | 15.10.2003 | |
IE | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
ES | 26.01.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | GB | 15.10.2003 | |
IE | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
ES | 26.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | GB | 15.10.2003 | |
IE | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
ES | 26.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | GB | 15.10.2003 | |
IE | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | IE | 15.10.2003 | |
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | IE | 15.10.2003 | |
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | NL | 15.10.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 15.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1267985 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * column 3, line 13 - line 47; figures 1-4 *; | [AD]EP0354725 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0639713 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,6* figure 1 *; | [A]GB2281359 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 7, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 * |