EP0740571 - BINGO GAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weingardt, Gary 5416 Gipsy Avenue Las Vegas, NV 89107 / US | [1996/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weingardt, Gary 5416 Gipsy Avenue Las Vegas, NV 89107 / US | 02 /
Devine, Opal 5416 Gipsy Avenue Las Vegas, NV 89107 / US | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers 4, Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95911566.8 | 17.01.1995 | [1996/45] | WO1995US00728 | Priority number, date | US19940182850 | 18.01.1994 Original published format: US 182850 | US19940366982 | 29.12.1994 Original published format: US 366982 | [1996/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9519207 | Date: | 20.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740571 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740571 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/06 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
A63F3/0645 (EP,US);
A63F2003/0017 (EP,US);
A63F2007/4043 (EP,US);
A63F7/048 (EP,US);
A63F9/0468 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/45] | Title | German: | BINGOSPIEL | [1996/45] | English: | BINGO GAME | [1996/45] | French: | JEU DE BINGO | [1996/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/44] | Request for further processing for: | 23.06.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2000 | BE | 08.11.2000 | CH | 08.11.2000 | FR | 08.11.2000 | IT | 08.11.2000 | LI | 08.11.2000 | LU | 17.01.2001 | MC | 31.01.2001 | DK | 08.02.2001 | PT | 08.02.2001 | DE | 09.02.2001 | GR | 09.02.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/39] | AT | 08.11.2000 | |
BE | 08.11.2000 | ||
CH | 08.11.2000 | ||
FR | 08.11.2000 | ||
LI | 08.11.2000 | ||
LU | 17.01.2001 | ||
MC | 31.01.2001 | ||
DK | 08.02.2001 | ||
PT | 08.02.2001 | ||
DE | 09.02.2001 | ||
GR | 09.02.2001 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 08.11.2000 | |
BE | 08.11.2000 | ||
CH | 08.11.2000 | ||
FR | 08.11.2000 | ||
LI | 08.11.2000 | ||
LU | 17.01.2001 | ||
DK | 08.02.2001 | ||
PT | 08.02.2001 | ||
DE | 09.02.2001 | ||
GR | 09.02.2001 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 08.11.2000 | |
BE | 08.11.2000 | ||
CH | 08.11.2000 | ||
FR | 08.11.2000 | ||
LI | 08.11.2000 | ||
LU | 17.01.2001 | ||
DK | 08.02.2001 | ||
PT | 08.02.2001 | ||
DE | 09.02.2001 | ||
Former [2004/35] | AT | 08.11.2000 | |
BE | 08.11.2000 | ||
CH | 08.11.2000 | ||
FR | 08.11.2000 | ||
LI | 08.11.2000 | ||
DK | 08.02.2001 | ||
PT | 08.02.2001 | ||
DE | 09.02.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 08.11.2000 | |
BE | 08.11.2000 | ||
CH | 08.11.2000 | ||
LI | 08.11.2000 | ||
DK | 08.02.2001 | ||
PT | 08.02.2001 | ||
DE | 09.02.2001 | ||
FR | 06.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 08.11.2000 | |
BE | 08.11.2000 | ||
CH | 08.11.2000 | ||
LI | 08.11.2000 | ||
PT | 08.02.2001 | ||
DE | 09.02.2001 | ||
FR | 06.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/11] | AT | 08.11.2000 | |
BE | 08.11.2000 | ||
CH | 08.11.2000 | ||
LI | 08.11.2000 | ||
PT | 08.02.2001 | ||
FR | 06.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 08.11.2000 | |
BE | 08.11.2000 | ||
CH | 08.11.2000 | ||
LI | 08.11.2000 | ||
FR | 06.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 08.11.2000 | |
BE | 08.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 08.11.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8504338 (CONLEN THOMAS RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * claims 7,8 *; | [AY]US4807882 (CIMINO ROBERT [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - line 36 * [Y] 5-7; | [A]WO9103288 (SCHWARTZ DAVID S [FR]) [A] 5-7* page 3, line 14 - line 16; claim 7 *; | [Y]US5192076 (KOMORI TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * column 3, line 40 - line 64 *; | [Y]US5230514 (FRAIN JOHN J [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 3, line 53 - line 56 * |