EP0748462 - Tray for a fibre distribution frame system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/51] | FIBER DISTRIBUTION FRAME SYSTEM | ||
[1998/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIDACOVICH, Kenneth, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
DOSS, Don P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 95911604.7 | 02.02.1995 | [1996/51] | WO1995US01376 | Priority number, date | US19940203822 | 01.03.1994 Original published format: US 203822 | [1996/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9523991 | Date: | 08.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748462 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0748462 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
G02B6/4455 (EP,US);
G02B6/4452 (US);
G02B6/44524 (EP);
G02B6/44528 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/51] | Title | German: | Behälter für ein faseroptisches Verteilergestell | [1998/52] | English: | Tray for a fibre distribution frame system | [1998/52] | French: | Plateau pour un système repartiteur de fibres | [1998/52] |
Former [1996/51] | FASEROPTISCHES VERTEILERGESTELL | ||
Former [1996/51] | FIBER DISTRIBUTION FRAME SYSTEM | ||
Former [1996/51] | SYSTEME REPARTITEUR DE FIBRES | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 11.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.02.2002 | ES | 28.02.2002 | [2009/30] |
Former [2003/01] | GB | 02.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4792203 (NELSON CALVIN G [US], et al); | [AD]US4824196 (BYLANDER JAMES R [US]); | [Y]DE8905509U ; | [Y]EP0356942 (GTE PROD CORP [US]); | [Y]WO9110927 (PORTA SYSTEMS CORP [US]); | [Y]GB2255652 (SIRTI SPA [IT]); | [A]FR2678076 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [AD]US5241617 (PEACOCK JOHN [GB], et al); | [E]WO9507486 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) |