EP0748398 - SPRAY PROCESSES USING A GASEOUS FLOW FOR PREPARING BIODEGRADABLE FIBRILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/51] | SPRAY PROCESSES USING A GASEOUS FLOW FOR PREPARING BIODEGRADABLE FIBRILS, NONWOVEN FABRICS COMPRISING BIODEGRADABLE FIBRILS, AND ARTICLES COMPRISING SUCH NONWOVEN FABRICS | ||
[1998/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NODA, Isao 1568 Hunter Road Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | 02 /
LAMPE, Reinhold, August 2424 Chapel Road Okeana, OH 45053 / US | 03 /
SATKOWSKI, Michael, Matthew 30-2B Westwood Drive Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Boulinguiez, Didier, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Boulinguiez, Didier, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1996/51] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H., et al Procter & Gamble GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 95911667.4 | 10.02.1995 | [1996/51] | WO1995US01690 | Priority number, date | US19940203260 | 28.02.1994 Original published format: US 203260 | [1996/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9523249 | Date: | 31.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748398 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0748398 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/098, D04H1/56, D04H1/42, A61L15/00, D01F6/62 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
A61L15/26 (EP,US);
A61L15/62 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
C08G63/08 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C09J167/04 (EP,US);
D01D5/0985 (EP,US);
D01F6/62 (EP,US);
D04H1/425 (EP,US);
D04H1/4309 (EP,US);
D04H1/435 (EP,US);
C08J2367/04 (EP,US);
Y10T442/608 (EP,US);
Y10T442/609 (EP,US);
Y10T442/671 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/26, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/51] | Title | German: | SPRÜHVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES GASSTROMES ZUR HERSTELLUNG BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARER FIBRILLEN | [1998/45] | English: | SPRAY PROCESSES USING A GASEOUS FLOW FOR PREPARING BIODEGRADABLE FIBRILS | [1998/45] | French: | PROCEDES DE PULVERISATION FAISANT APPEL A UN ECOULEMENT GAZEUX ET DESTINES A LA PRODUCTION DE FIBRILLES BIODEGRADABLES | [1998/45] |
Former [1996/51] | SPRÜHVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES GASSTROMES ZUR HERSTELLUNG BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARER FIBRILLEN, DIESE FIEBRILLEN ENTHALTENDE VLIESSTOFFE UND DIESE VLIESSTOFFE ENTHALTENDE PRODUKTE | ||
Former [1996/51] | SPRAY PROCESSES USING A GASEOUS FLOW FOR PREPARING BIODEGRADABLE FIBRILS, NONWOVEN FABRICS COMPRISING BIODEGRADABLE FIBRILS, AND ARTICLES COMPRISING SUCH NONWOVEN FABRICS | ||
Former [1996/51] | PROCEDES DE PULVERISATION FAISANT APPEL A UN ECOULEMENT GAZEUX ET DESTINES A LA PRODUCTION DE FIBRILLES BIODEGRADABLES, NON TISSES COMPRENANT CES FIBRILLES BIODEGRADABLES, ET ARTICLES COMPRENANT DE TELS NON-TISSES | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 09.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3849040 (SWANDER R, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 61 *; | [XY]EP0176316 (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,10,12,17 * the whole document * [Y] 13,14; | [A]EP0177207 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [Y]GB2243327 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 13,14 * page 7, line 16 - line 23; claim - *; | [XY]EP0534562 (UNITAKA LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10,12,17 * page 6, line 35 - line 54; examples 5-7; claims 1,2,7,10 * [Y] 13,14; | [PXY]WO9408078 (CARGILL INC [US]) [PX] 1-4,6,7,9,10,12,17 * examples 3,4; claims 1,4,17,18,25 * [Y] 13,14 |