EP0750823 - TEST PORT FOR NETWORK INTERFACE DEVICE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | ||
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPPER, Harry, Milton 153 Kingswood Drive Harrisburg, PA 17112 / US | 02 /
HOWER, James, Shannon 525 Harvest Drive Harrisburg, PA 17111 / US | 03 /
ROBERTSON, James, William 1087 5th Avenue Oberlin, PA 17113 / US | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion Tyco Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion AMP International Enterprises Limited Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach (SG) / CH | Application number, filing date | 95911703.7 | 13.02.1995 | [1997/01] | WO1995US01802 | Priority number, date | US19940213137 | 15.03.1994 Original published format: US 213137 | [1997/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9525405 | Date: | 21.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750823 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750823 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/02, H01R13/703, H01R13/52 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
H01R4/2433 (EP,US);
H04Q1/02 (KR);
H01R13/5219 (EP,US);
H01R13/70 (EP,US);
H04Q1/021 (EP,US);
H04Q1/028 (EP,US);
H04Q1/20 (EP,US);
H01R31/08 (EP,US);
H04M3/301 (EP,US);
H04Q1/144 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/01] | Title | German: | TEST ANSCHLUSS FÜR NETZWERKSCHNITTSTELLEEINHEITSMODUL | [1997/01] | English: | TEST PORT FOR NETWORK INTERFACE DEVICE MODULE | [1997/01] | French: | PORT D'ESSAI POUR UN MODULE DE DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE DE RESEAU | [1997/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.1996 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 29.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.10.1999 | NL | 06.10.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 06.10.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9323960 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1,11,14 * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 6 *; | [A]EP0127349 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1,11,14 * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 6 *; | [A]WO9204794 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1,11,14 * page 62, line 21 - page 64, line 25; figure 21 *; | [A]US4726787 (STINE JON D [US]); | [A]GB2161996 (AMP INC) |