EP0745086 - TRICYCLIC SPIROPIPERIDINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAREMON, David, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
PONTICELLO, Gerald, S. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 03 /
SELNICK, Harold, G. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | Hiscock, Ian James European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | Hiscock, Ian James European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 95911762.3 | 15.02.1995 | [1996/49] | WO1995US01960 | Priority number, date | US19940198940 | 18.02.1994 Original published format: US 198940 | [1996/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9522548 | Date: | 24.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745086 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/107, C07D221/20, A61K31/435, // (C07D491/107, 311:00, 221:00) | [1997/18] | CPC: |
C07D221/20 (EP,US);
A61P9/06 (EP);
C07D491/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/49] | C07D491/107, C07D221/20, A61K31/55, A61K31/70, A61K31/735, A61K31/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/49] | Title | German: | TRICYCLISCHE SPIROPIPERIDINE | [1996/49] | English: | TRICYCLIC SPIROPIPERIDINES | [1996/49] | French: | SPIROPIPERIDINES TRICYCLIQUES | [1996/49] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1996 | Search fee paid | 18.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 23.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/14] | 23.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0431943 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-12 * examples 237,451; claims 1-5,9,10 * * page 146; table XXXVIII, 4th compound *; | US5206240 [ ] (BALDWIN JOHN J [US], et al); | [PX]WO9417045 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PX] 1,3-5,7,8 * claims 1-3,6,7 *; | [PX]WO9418204 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,4-12 * examples 46,47,49,50; claims 1,10-13 *; | [PA]WO9501335 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PA] 1-14 * claims 1-3,9-19 *; | US5382587 [ ] (BALDWIN JOHN J [US], et al) | [A] - ELLIOT J.M. ET AL., "4-Oxospiro[benzopyran-2,4'-piperidines] as class III antiarrhythmic agents. Pharmacological studies on 3,4-dihydro-1'-[2-(benzofurazan-5-yl)-ethyl]-6-methanesulfonamidospiro[(2H)-1-benzopyran-2,4'-piperidin]-4-one (L-691,121)", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (19921016), vol. 35, no. 21, pages 3973 - 3976, XP000611486 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00099a028 | International search | [AP]US5382587 (BALDWIN JOHN J [US], et al); | [A]US5206240 (BALDWIN JOHN J [US], et al); | [A]US5219860 (CHAMBERS MARK S [GB], et al); | [A]US5091387 (EVANS BEN E [US], et al); | [XP]WO9418204 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) |