EP0754083 - PROCESS FOR SEPARATING MATERIAL FROM MIXTURE USING DISPLACEMENT CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SRI International 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park California 94025-3493 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states SRI INTERNATIONAL 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park, California 94025-3493 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHER, William, J. 719 E1 Granada Boulevard Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95911901.7 | 23.02.1995 | [1997/04] | WO1995US02288 | Priority number, date | US19940223165 | 05.04.1994 Original published format: US 223165 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9526795 | Date: | 12.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754083 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0754083 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/08 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
B01D15/422 (EP,US);
B01J39/26 (EP,US);
G01N30/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
G01N30/02, B01D15/422 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG EINES MATERIALS VON EINER MISCHUNG DURCH VERDRÄNGUNGSCHROMATOGRAPHIE | [1997/04] | English: | PROCESS FOR SEPARATING MATERIAL FROM MIXTURE USING DISPLACEMENT CHROMATOGRAPHY | [1997/04] | French: | PROCEDE DE SEPARATION DE MATERIAU D'UN MELANGE PAR CHROMATOGRAPHIE A DEPLACEMENT | [1997/04] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 11.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.1999 | BE | 14.07.1999 | CH | 14.07.1999 | ES | 14.07.1999 | FR | 14.07.1999 | GR | 14.07.1999 | IT | 14.07.1999 | LI | 14.07.1999 | NL | 14.07.1999 | SE | 14.07.1999 | DK | 14.10.1999 | PT | 14.10.1999 | GB | 23.02.2000 | IE | 23.02.2000 | LU | 23.02.2000 | MC | 29.02.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
CH | 14.07.1999 | ||
ES | 14.07.1999 | ||
FR | 14.07.1999 | ||
GR | 14.07.1999 | ||
LI | 14.07.1999 | ||
NL | 14.07.1999 | ||
SE | 14.07.1999 | ||
DK | 14.10.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
GB | 23.02.2000 | ||
IE | 23.02.2000 | ||
LU | 23.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
CH | 14.07.1999 | ||
ES | 14.07.1999 | ||
GR | 14.07.1999 | ||
LI | 14.07.1999 | ||
NL | 14.07.1999 | ||
SE | 14.07.1999 | ||
DK | 14.10.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
GB | 23.02.2000 | ||
IE | 23.02.2000 | ||
LU | 23.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
CH | 14.07.1999 | ||
ES | 14.07.1999 | ||
GR | 14.07.1999 | ||
LI | 14.07.1999 | ||
NL | 14.07.1999 | ||
SE | 14.07.1999 | ||
DK | 14.10.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
GB | 23.02.2000 | ||
IE | 23.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
CH | 14.07.1999 | ||
ES | 14.07.1999 | ||
LI | 14.07.1999 | ||
NL | 14.07.1999 | ||
SE | 14.07.1999 | ||
DK | 14.10.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
GB | 23.02.2000 | ||
IE | 23.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
CH | 14.07.1999 | ||
ES | 14.07.1999 | ||
LI | 14.07.1999 | ||
NL | 14.07.1999 | ||
SE | 14.07.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
GB | 23.02.2000 | ||
IE | 23.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
CH | 14.07.1999 | ||
ES | 14.07.1999 | ||
LI | 14.07.1999 | ||
SE | 14.07.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
GB | 23.02.2000 | ||
IE | 23.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
CH | 14.07.1999 | ||
ES | 14.07.1999 | ||
LI | 14.07.1999 | ||
SE | 14.07.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
GB | 23.02.2000 | ||
IE | 23.02.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
CH | 14.07.1999 | ||
LI | 14.07.1999 | ||
SE | 14.07.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
GB | 23.02.2000 | ||
IE | 23.02.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
CH | 14.07.1999 | ||
LI | 14.07.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
GB | 23.02.2000 | ||
IE | 23.02.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
CH | 14.07.1999 | ||
LI | 14.07.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
GB | 23.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
CH | 14.07.1999 | ||
LI | 14.07.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
CH | 19.10.1999 | ||
LI | 19.10.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
PT | 14.10.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | ||
FR | 10.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 14.07.1999 | |
BE | 14.07.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4274967 (SNYDER LLOYD R); | [A]US4724081 (KAWAHARA AKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 35 - column 8, line 32 *; | [A]EP0359322 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 45 - page 4, line 31 * | [A] - ZIAD EL RASSI, "HIGH-PERFORMANCE DISPLACEMENT...SYSTEM", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, AMSTERDAM, vol. 266, pages 319 - 340 [A] 1,6,20,29 * page 321 - page 326 * | Examination | EP0371648 |