EP0754039 - METHODS OF USING IRON CHELATING COMPOUNDS TO REDUCE FREE RADICAL DAMAGE IN MAMMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISSETT, Donald L. 3925 Dust Commander Drive Hamilton, OH 45011 / US | 02 /
SHAYA, Steven Alan 3618 Fawnrun Drive Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Proctor & Gamble (Health & Beauty Care) Limited Rusham Park Whitehall Lane, Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble (Health & Beauty Care) Limited Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 95912791.1 | 06.03.1995 | [1997/04] | WO1995US02872 | Priority number, date | US19940224949 | 08.04.1994 Original published format: US 224949 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9527485 | Date: | 19.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754039 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.10.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/335, A61K31/34, A61K31/27, A61K31/13, A61K31/12, A61K31/16 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/12 (EP);
A61K31/15 (EP);
A61K31/16 (EP);
A61K31/27 (EP);
A61K31/325 (EP);
A61K31/34 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON EISEN-CHELATBILDNERN ZUR REDUKTION DER DURCH FREIE RADIKALE VERURSACHTEN SCHADEN BEI SÄUGERN | [1997/04] | English: | METHODS OF USING IRON CHELATING COMPOUNDS TO REDUCE FREE RADICAL DAMAGE IN MAMMALS | [1997/04] | French: | METHODES D'UTILISATION DE CHELATES CONTENANT DU FER POUR DIMINUER LES ATTEINTES DUES AUX RADICAUX LIBRES CHEZ LES MAMMIFERES | [1997/04] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.1996 | Search fee paid | 04.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 28.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 14.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0313305 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * * page 4, line 56 - page 5, line 8 * * page 7, line 25 - line 28 *; | [X]WO9116034 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 5 * * page 14, line 8 - line 17 *; | [X]WO9216200 (US ARMY [US]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 8 *; | [AD] - HALLIWELL B, "PROTECTION AGAINST TISSUE DAMAGE IN-VIVO BY DESFERRIOXAMINE WHAT IS ITS MECHANISM OF ACTION?", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1989), Database accession no. PREV199038052111, XP002187995 [AD] 1-4,7 * abstract * | [ ] - FREE RADICAL BIOLOGY & MEDICINE, (1989), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 0891-5849, pages 645 - 652, XP001058483 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0891-5849(89)90145-7 | International search | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 115, No. 4, issued 12 March 1991, HALLIWELL; & FREE RADICAL BIOL. MED., 1989, 7(6), 645-651, abstract no. 21476t. | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 118, No. 12, issued 26 July 1993, FEORINO et al.; & ANTIVIRAL CHEM. CHEMOTHER., 1993, 4(1), 55-63, abstract no. 182829n. |