EP0749359 - MASKING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASTOW, David, R. 2 Warwicke Road, Tamworth Staffordshire B77 3EU / GB | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [1996/52] | Bowman, Paul Alan LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 95912799.4 | 02.03.1995 | [1996/52] | WO1995US02893 | Priority number, date | GB19940004417 | 08.03.1994 Original published format: GB 9404417 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9524273 | Date: | 14.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0749359 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0749359 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/04 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
B29C59/007 (EP);
B05B12/24 (EP);
B05B12/26 (EP);
B05B12/265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABDECKUNG | [1996/52] | English: | MASKING METHOD | [1996/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE MASQUAGE | [1996/52] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0326379 ; | [DA]EP0384626 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [GB]) [DA] 12,14 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910412), vol. 15, no. 145, Database accession no. (C - 0823), & JP03026379 A 00000000 (HONDA) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |