EP0757595 - COMBINATION ROLL AND DIE COATING METHOD AND APPARATUS WITH IMPROVED DIE LIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Omar, D. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MAIER, Gary, W. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1997/07] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 95912929.7 | 17.03.1995 | [1997/07] | WO1995US03367 | Priority number, date | US19940236568 | 29.04.1994 Original published format: US 236568 | [1997/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9529765 | Date: | 09.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0757595 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757595 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B05C5/02, B05C1/08 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
B05C1/0813 (EP,KR);
B05C1/0817 (EP,KR);
B05C5/0254 (EP,KR);
B05C9/06 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KOMBINIERTEN WALZEN- UND EXTRUSIONSBESCHICHTUNG | [1997/07] | English: | COMBINATION ROLL AND DIE COATING METHOD AND APPARATUS WITH IMPROVED DIE LIP | [1997/07] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ENDUCTION PAR ROULEAU ET FILIERE COMBINES A LEVRE DE FILIERE PERFECTIONNEE | [1997/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 12.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.05.1999 | NL | 12.05.1999 | [2003/08] |
Former [2000/23] | BE | 12.05.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0466420 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * * column 6, line 11 - line 19; figure - *; | [X]US4774109 (HADZIMIHALIS THEODORE M [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 48 - line 54; figure 3 *; | [X]EP0196029 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 9, line 3 - page 10, line 22; figure 2 *; | [X]DE4304281 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 22 - line 49; figure - *; | [A]US4332840 (TANAKA YASUNORI, et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0545084 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1,2,4 * figure - *; | [A]GB1192515 (WILLYNCK MAXIME GEORGES [FR]) [A] 1,2,4 * page 3, line 95 - page 4, line 13; figure - *; | [A]GB2040738 (BELOIT CORP) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [A]GB1098434 (LOWE PAPER CO) [A] 1,2,4 * page 1, line 52 - line 58; figure - *; | [AD]US4445458 (O'BRIEN WILLIAM G [US]) [AD] 7 * figure - * | [A] - "MANUFACTURING OF SOLVENT-BASED IMAGE-FORMING MATERIALS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, EMSWORTH, GB, (199202), no. 334, pages 111 - 117, XP000291212 [A] 4,5 * figure 1 * |