EP0750546 - PROCESS FOR JOINING SECTIONS MADE OF ELASTOMER MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHOENIX AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Hannoversche Strasse 88 21079 Hamburg / DE | [1997/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRABE, Werner Kiefernweg 4 D-21423 Winsen / DE | 02 /
GLANG, Siegfried Bredengrund 24a D-21149 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
GUTSCHMIDT, Holger Kurz Schumacher Strasse 73a D-21629 Neu Wulmstorf / DE | [1997/01] | Application number, filing date | 95913017.0 | 15.03.1995 | [1997/01] | WO1995DE00338 | Priority number, date | DE19944409293 | 18.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4409293 | [1997/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9525629 | Date: | 28.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750546 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750546 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0750546 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/50, B29C65/02 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
B29C66/1142 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C65/4835 (EP);
B29C65/5057 (EP);
B29C65/7841 (EP);
B29C66/1162 (EP);
B29C66/52431 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/72523 (EP);
B29C65/04 (EP);
B29C66/022 (EP);
B29K2021/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2021/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON PROFILEN AUS ELASTOMEREM WERKSTOFF | [1997/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR JOINING SECTIONS MADE OF ELASTOMER MATERIALS | [1997/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE JONCTION DE PROFILES EN MATERIAUX ELASTOMERES | [1997/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.04.1999
26.04.1999
ADMISSIBLE NorMec A/S P.O.Box 290 N 3570 AI / NO Opponent's representative O'Reilly, Peter Andrew Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | 02
15.04.1999
WITHDRAWN Draftex GmbH & Co K.G. Postfach 10 03 63 41703 Viersen 1 / DE Opponent's representative Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.04.1999
26.04.1999
ADMISSIBLE NorMec A/S P.O.Box 290 N 3570 AI / NO Opponent's representative O'Reilly, Peter Andrew Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | ||
02
15.04.1999
WITHDRAWN Draftex GmbH & Co K.G. Postfach 10 03 63 41703 Viersen 1 / DE Opponent's representative Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan Mathisen, Macara & Co., The Coach House, 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | 20.05.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.11.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.11.1999 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2000 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 15.11.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.11.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.05.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 15.07.1998 | DK | 15.10.1998 | PT | 15.10.1998 | IE | 19.02.1999 | LU | 15.03.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2004/39] | GR | 15.07.1998 | |
DK | 15.10.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
IE | 19.02.1999 | ||
LU | 15.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | GR | 15.07.1998 | |
DK | 15.10.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
IE | 19.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GR | 15.07.1998 | |
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
IE | 19.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/01] | GR | 15.07.1998 | |
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 15.07.1998 | |
IE | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
Former [2001/01] | IE | 15.07.1998 | |
PT | 15.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 15.10.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0494922 ; | [Y]US2721924 (WERNER RUEGGEBERG) [Y] 2,4 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2903543 (WERNER RUEGGEBERG) [A] * figure - *; | [A]US3186891 (GELLING HOMER R, et al) [A] 1-9 * figure - *; | [XY]US3400030 (BURGER EDWIN M) [X] 1,3,5-9 * figure -; claim 6 * [Y] 2,4; | [A]FR2085459 (NGUYEN CONG KHANH, et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE3012387 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-9 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4; | [A]EP0182009 (REHAU AG & CO) [A] * figure - *; | [A]DE3739058 (ZAENGL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 53 - line 58; figure -; claim 7 *; | [A]US4929304 (URAI MUNEHARU [JP], et al) [A] 5,7 * figure 11 *; | [XY]DE3906278 (MUETSCH ADOLF [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5-9 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4; | [XY]GB2240980 (UNIV VIRGINA ALUMNI PATENTS FO [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-9 * page 1, line 24 - line 36; figure -; claim 1 * [Y] 2,4; | [A]DE9114138U (SCHLEGEL) [A] 1,2 * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 8, line 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920720), vol. 016, no. 331, Database accession no. (M - 1282), & JP04094922 A 19920327 (AISIN SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1,2,8 * abstract * |