EP0815002 - BEARING ARRANGEMENT FOR LIMITING DEFLECTION OF A TURRET OF A TURRET MOORING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Single Buoy Moorings Inc. 5, Route de Fribourg P.O. Box 124 CH-1723 Marly / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states SINGLE BUOY MOORINGS INC. 5, Route de Fribourg P.O. Box 124 CH-1723 Marly / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUD, Jean 3, chemin des Oliviers F-06320 La Turbie / FR | 02 /
POLDERVAART, Leendert 92, Les Hautes de Monte-Carlo F-06 La Turbie / FR | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 95913101.2 | 08.03.1995 | [1998/02] | WO1995EP00934 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9627522 | Date: | 12.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0815002 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0815002 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B63B22/02 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B63B21/507 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, NL [1998/02] | Title | German: | LAGEREINRICHTUNG FÜR DIE BESCHRÄNKUNG VON TURMABLENKUNGEN IN EINEM TURMVERANKERUNGSSYSTEM | [1998/02] | English: | BEARING ARRANGEMENT FOR LIMITING DEFLECTION OF A TURRET OF A TURRET MOORING DEVICE | [1998/02] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE PALIER PERMETTANT DE LIMITER LA DEVIATION D'UNE TOURELLE DANS UN DISPOSITIF D'AMARRAGE PAR TOURELLE | [1998/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/05] | 06.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.11.1997 | M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8602329 (KEY OCEAN SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 12; figure - *; | [A]EP0227279 (FLUOR CORP [US]) [A] 1* column A; figure - *; | [X]WO8706555 (KEY OCEAN SERVICES INC [US]) [X] 1,6 * page 6, line 10 - line 26; figure - * |