EP0751944 - THIAZOLIDINES AND OXAZOLIDINES SUBSTITUTED BY A PYRIDINE RING AND THEIR USE AS HYPOGLYCEMIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 7-1, Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 7-1, Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHARA, Yoshio, Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Mikio, Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274 / JP | 03 /
MIYACHI, Nobuhide, Nissan Chemical Ind., Ltd. Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274 / JP | 04 /
KATO, Katsuhiro, Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274 / JP | 05 /
OHDOI, Keisuke, Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274 / JP | 06 /
KOBAYASHI, Tetsuya, Nissan Chemical Ind., Ltd. Central Research Institute, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274 4 / JP | 07 /
SHIKADA, K., Nissan Chem. Ind. Ltd, Seibutsukagaku Kenkyusho 1470, Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minamisaitama-gun, Saitama 349-02 / JP | 08 /
NAITO, T., Nissan Chem. Ind. Ltd, Seibutsukagaku Kenkyusho, 1470, Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minamisaitama-gun, Saitama 349-02 / JP | 09 /
YOTSUMOTO, T., Nissan Chem.Ind.Ltd, Seibutsukagaku Kenkyusho, 1470, Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minamisaitama-gun, Saitama 349-02 / JP | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95913343.0 | 27.03.1995 | [1997/02] | WO1995JP00560 | Priority number, date | JP19940057192 | 28.03.1994 Original published format: JP 5719294 | JP19940295177 | 29.11.1994 Original published format: JP 29517794 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9526347 | Date: | 05.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0751944 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0751944 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, C07D417/06, C07D413/14, A61K31/425, A61K31/42 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
C07D417/06 (EP,KR);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07D417/14 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/02] | Title | German: | DURCH EINEN PYRIDINRING SUBSTITUIERTE THIAZOLIDINE UND OXAZOLIDINE UND IHRE ANWENDUNG ALS HYPOGLYKÄMISCHE MITTEL | [1997/02] | English: | THIAZOLIDINES AND OXAZOLIDINES SUBSTITUTED BY A PYRIDINE RING AND THEIR USE AS HYPOGLYCEMIC AGENTS | [1997/02] | French: | THIAZOLIDINES ET OXAZOLIDINES SUBSTITUES PAR UNE PYRIDINE CYCLIQUE ET UTILISATION COMME PRINCIPES HYPOGLYCEMIANTS | [1997/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0332332 (PFIZER [US]) [DA] 1,12-14 * examples 18,19; claim - *; | [DA]EP0332331 (PFIZER [US]) [DA] 1,12-14 * claim - *; | [DXP]EP0605228 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [DXP] 1,12-14* claim - *; | JPH0864586 [ ] (APPLIED MATERIALS INC) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19801027), vol. 93, no. 17, Database accession no. 168259k, page 679, column 2 [X] 1,12-14 * abstract * | [AX] - TAKASHI SOHDA ET AL, "Studies on antidiabetic agents.II. Synthesis of 5-(4(1-methylcyclohexylmethoxy)-benzyl]thiazolidine-2,4-dione (ADD-3878) and its derivatives", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, TOKYO JP, vol. 30, no. 10, pages 3580 - 3600 [A] 1,12-14 * the whole document * *page3588,tableVII* [X] 1,12-14 |