EP0754424 - FLOWER VASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUMURA KOGEI CO., LTD. 2-23, Chodo 3-chome Higashiosaka Osaka 577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states MATSUMURA KOGEI CO., LTD. 2-23, Chodo 3-chome Higashiosaka, Osaka 577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Masami 2-23, Chodo 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 577 / JP | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Kahler, Kurt Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener Vorderer Anger 268 86899 Landsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., Vorderer Anger 268 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | Application number, filing date | 95913410.7 | 03.04.1995 | [1997/04] | WO1995JP00640 | Priority number, date | JP19940005376U | 05.04.1994 Original published format: JP 537694 U | [1997/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9526666 | Date: | 12.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754424 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A01G5/04 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
A01G5/04 (EP);
A01G5/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/04] | A47G7/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [1997/04] | Title | German: | BLUMENVASE | [1997/04] | English: | FLOWER VASE | [1997/04] | French: | VASE A FLEURS | [1997/04] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.1996 | Translation filed | 31.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.1996 | Search fee paid | 31.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 31.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 31.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/17] | 27.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2193909 (TRIFOAM PRODUCTS LIMITED) [X] 1,3-7 * page 2, line 32 - line 37 *; | [X]FR2693092 (MARGNON DANIEL [FR]) [X] 1,2,13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0241341 (EYCHENNE CAMILLE) [X] 1,8,13 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]GB2131687 (TRIDENT FOAMS LIMITED) [X] 1,12 * page 2, line 91 - line 94; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0586836 (HIGHLAND SUPPLY CORP [US]) [A] 9-11 * column 4, line 5 - line 14; figures 8,9 * | International search | [X]JPS5959165U ; | [A]JPH0246542U ; | [A]JPS5089695U ; | [A]JPS5223691U |