EP0787113 - SHOCK TUBE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE ENSIGN-BICKFORD COMPANY 660 Hopmeadow Street, P.O. Box 483 Simsbury, CT 06070-0483 / US | [1997/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOBCZAK, Brian, R. 15 Griffin Road Granby, CT 06035 / US | 02 /
LUCCA, Frank, J. 175 Mountain Road North Granby, CT 06060 / US | 03 /
THOMAS, J., Donaldson 2 Dominique Lane Simsbury, CT 06070 / US | 04 /
ADAMS, Craig, F. 19 Intervale Road Granby, CT 06035 / US | 05 /
GLADDEN, Ernest, L. 14 Evangeline Place Granby, CT 06035 / US | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95913524.5 | 03.03.1995 | [1997/32] | WO1995US02590 | Priority number, date | US19940212200 | 11.03.1994 Original published format: US 212200 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9524365 | Date: | 14.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0787113 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0787113 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.09.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C06C5/04, F42B39/14 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
F42D1/04 (EP,US);
C06C5/04 (EP,US);
C06C5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1997/32] | Title | German: | SPRENGSCHNURANORDNUNG | [1997/32] | English: | SHOCK TUBE ASSEMBLY | [1997/32] | French: | ENSEMBLE TUBE A ONDE DE CHOC | [1997/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.1996 | Search fee paid | 25.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 01.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2200977 (AECI LTD) [A] 1,11 * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 14; figure 1; claim 11 * | International search | [A]US746262 (GILLIES DONALD B [US]); | [A]US1996855 (CHESWRIGHT LEONARD K); | [A]US3057296 (DANIEL SILVERMAN); | [A]US3169480 (SEAVEY FREDERICK R); | [A]US3469863 (RIESTER WILLIAM C, et al); | [A]US3590739 (PERSSON PER-ANDERS); | [A]US3706277 (WILLARD ROBERT C, et al); | [A]US3767233 (HODGE G); | [A]US3774541 ; | [A]US3981240 (GLADDEN ERNEST LAIRD); | [A]US3987732 (SPRAGGS RICHARD WILLIAM, et al); | [A]US4328753 (KRISTENSEN LEIF, et al); | [A]US4597594 (KACALIEFF CHRIST D [US], et al); | [A]US4607573 (THURESON GARY R [US], et al); | [A]US4757764 (THURESON GARY R [US], et al); | [A]US4771694 (BARTHOLOMEW STEPHEN W [US], et al) |