EP0754364 - FLUID BEARING WITH COMPLIANT LINKAGE FOR CENTERING RECIPROCATING BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNPOWER, INC. 182 Mill Street Athens, OH 45701 / US | [2002/10] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states SUNPOWER, INC. 6 Byard Street Athens, OH 45701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEALE, William, T. 13818 Robinson Ridge Road Athens, OH 45701 / US | 02 /
VAN DER WALT, Nicholas, R. 33 Warren Road Athens, OH 45701 / US | 03 /
UNGER, Reuven, Z. 7 West Hills Drive Athens, OH 45701 / US | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Hall, Robert Leonard Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Hall, Robert Leonard Dibb, Lupton, Broomhead, Fountain Precinct, Balm Green Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95913534.4 | 02.03.1995 | [1997/04] | WO1995US02640 | Priority number, date | US19940214984 | 21.03.1994 Original published format: US 214984 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9526070 | Date: | 28.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754364 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0754364 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.09.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02K33/00, F04B39/04, F04B53/00, F02G1/043 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
F04B39/045 (EP,US);
H02K7/08 (KR);
F02G1/0435 (EP,US);
F04B35/045 (EP,US);
F04B53/008 (EP,US);
H02K33/00 (EP,US);
F02B71/04 (EP,US);
F16F1/027 (EP,US);
H02K33/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/04] | H02K7/08, H02K5/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/04] | Title | German: | FLUIDLAGER MIT ELASTISCHEM GESTÄNGE ZUM ZENTRIEREN VON HIN- UND HERGEHENDEN KÖRPERN | [1997/04] | English: | FLUID BEARING WITH COMPLIANT LINKAGE FOR CENTERING RECIPROCATING BODIES | [1997/04] | French: | PALIER FLUIDE A LIAISON ELASTIQUE DESTINE AU CENTRAGE DE CORPS A MOUVEMENT DE VA-ET-VIENT | [2001/21] |
Former [1997/04] | PALIER FLUIDE A LIAISON ELASTIQUE DESTINE AU CENTRAGE DE CORPS EN VA-ET-VIENT | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.1996 | Search fee paid | 17.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3959673 (MONTAGU JEAN I); | [AP]US5323133 (HEATH MICHAEL C [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US4538964 (BROWN ALEC T [US]); | [Y]US4644851 (YOUNG NIELS O [US]); | [Y]US4894996 (KAZUMOTO YOSHIO [JP], et al) |