EP0749639 - HIGH-DENSITY ELECTRICAL INTERCONNECT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRANE, Stanford W., Jr. 3934 Northwest 57th Street Boca Raton, FL 33496 / US | [1996/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 6940 8002 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 8035 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 95913542.7 | 09.03.1995 | [1996/52] | WO1995US02679 | Priority number, date | US19940209219 | 11.03.1994 Original published format: US 209219 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9524748 | Date: | 14.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0749639 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0749639 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/26, H01R23/68 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
H01R13/26 (EP);
H01R12/718 (EP);
H01R12/73 (EP);
H01R12/721 (EP);
H01R12/85 (EP);
H01R13/193 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/52] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES VERBINDUNGS SYSTEM VON HOHER DICHTE | [1996/52] | English: | HIGH-DENSITY ELECTRICAL INTERCONNECT SYSTEM | [1996/52] | French: | SYSTEME ELECTRIQUE D'INTERCONNEXIONS A HAUTE DENSITE | [1996/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 18.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.08.1999 | NL | 25.08.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 25.08.1999 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4997376 (BUCK JONATHAN E [US], et al) [X] 1-13,19-31 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 29; figures 1-4 * [Y] 14-18,31-36; | [Y]GB1129608 (BURNDY CORP) [Y] 14-18,31-36 * page 2, line 26 - line 40; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5015207 (KOEPKE RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1-36 * column 3, line 36 - column 6, line 17; figure 3B *; | [A]US4897055 (JURISTA THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0405454 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1-36 * column 2, line 9 - column 4, line 14; figure 2 *; | [PX]WO9413034 (CRANE STANFORD W JR [US]) [PX] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [PX]US5330372 (POPE RICHARD A [US], et al) [PX] 1-13,19-31 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 39; figures 1,2 *; | [PX]WO9427345 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [PX] 1-13,19-31 * page 4, line 3 - page 8, line 20; figures 1,2 * |