EP0705172 - RECORDING SHEETS FOR INK JET PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILFORD Imaging Switzerland GmbH Route de l'Ancienne Papeterie Case postale 160 1723 Marly 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states Ilford Imaging Switzerland GmbH Route de l'Ancienne Papeterie, Case postale 160 1723 Marly 1 / CH | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Ilford Imaging Switzerland GmbH Industriestrasse 15 1705 Freiburg / CH | ||
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states ILFORD AG Industriestrasse 15 1701 Fribourg / CH | ||
Former [1996/15] | For all designated states ILFORD AG Industriestrasse 15 CH-1701 Fribourg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRYBERG, Mario Sur le Village CH-1724 Praroman / CH | 02 /
KURZEN, Roland Bachlisbrunnen CH-1713 Saint Antoni / CH | 03 /
HAARMANN, Klaus Route de l'Union 22B CH-1723 Marly / CH | 04 /
BLEDNICK, Diane 5835 Wildwood Drive Fairview, PA 16415 / US | 05 /
ROGERS, Daniel 600 Old Mill Road Erie, PA 16505 / US | [1996/15] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Richard Nordan Ilford Limited, Patents Department, Town Lane Mobberley, Knutsford Cheshire WA16 7JL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Matthews, Richard Nordan Ilford Limited, Patents Department, Town Lane Mobberley, Knutsford, Cheshire WA16 7JL / GB | ||
Former [1996/15] | Gallafent, Antony Xavier Gallafent & Co., 9 Staple Inn London WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95914443.7 | 06.04.1995 | [1996/15] | WO1995GB00784 | Priority number, date | GB19940007685 | 19.04.1994 Original published format: GB 9407685 | US19950385412 | 08.02.1995 Original published format: US 385412 | [1996/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9528285 | Date: | 26.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0705172 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0705172 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5236 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/273 (EP,US);
Y10T428/277 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/15] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSSCHICHT FÜR TINTENSTRAHLDRUCK | [1996/15] | English: | RECORDING SHEETS FOR INK JET PRINTING | [1996/15] | French: | FEUILLE D'IMPRESSION POUR IMPRESSION A JETS D'ENCRE | [1996/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 04.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.1997 | 30.04.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/not-exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | International Paper Company Two Manhattanville Road, Purchase New York 10577 / US | Date: | 09.07.1998 | [1998/38] | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2147003 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-37 * page 1, line 29 - line 44; claim 1 * * page 3, line 16 - line 29 *; | [X]US5011816 (BYERS GARY W [US], et al) [X] 1-37 * column 4, line 58 - line 65; claim 1 * * column 5, line 13 - line 58 *; | [X]US5118349 (JALON MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1-37 * examples 1-6; claim 1 *; | [X]US4146792 (STENZEL GERHARD, et al) [X] 1-37 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 11; examples 1-2; claims 5,6 * |