EP0758346 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF AN ELASTOMERIC POLYMER FROM ETHYLENE, ALPHA-OLEFIN AND OPTIONALLY DIENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENKEMA, Jacob Heer Ottostraat 25 6121 NB Born / NL | 02 /
MUSKENS, Bernardus, Johanna Gansbeek 64 NL-6166 JB Geleen / NL | [1998/31] |
Former [1997/08] | 01 /
RENKEMA, Jacob Grasbroekstraat 17 NL-6141 BW Sittard / NL | ||
02 /
MUSKENS, Bernardus, Johanna Gansbeek 64 NL-6166 JB Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 95914581.4 | 18.04.1995 | [1997/08] | WO1995NL00140 | Priority number, date | NL19940000758 | 06.05.1994 Original published format: NL 9400758 | [1997/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9530698 | Date: | 16.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758346 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758346 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/16, C08F4/602 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
C08F210/18 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/65925 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65925 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/06, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/09, C08F2500/21, C08F2500/05 (US,EP);
C08F210/18, C08F210/06, C08F2500/25, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/09, C08F2500/21, C08F2500/05 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1997/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELASTOMEREN AUS ETHYLEN, ALFA-OLEFIN UND GEGEBENFALLS DIEN | [1997/08] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF AN ELASTOMERIC POLYMER FROM ETHYLENE, ALPHA-OLEFIN AND OPTIONALLY DIENE | [1997/08] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN POLYMERE ELASTOMERE A PARTIR D'ETHYLENE, D'UNE ALPHA-OLEFINE ET EVENTUELLEMENT D'UN DIENE | [1997/08] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/08] | 16.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS61264035 ; | [X]FR2322883 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [X] 6* page 5, line 1 - line 5; example 2; table - *; | [A]EP0347128 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 6,9,10,13-15 * abstract * * examples 8-10; tables I-III *; | [A]EP0372414 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6 * example 11; claim -; table . * * page 5; figures II-1,II-2 *; | [X]WO9103505 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 6-16 * example 7B; claim -; table - * * page 25, paragraph 2 *; | [A]EP0545140 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * page 5, line 33 - line 42 * * claim -; table . *; | [A]EP0571882 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * page 11, line 22 - line 25 * * abstract * * page 6, line 10 - line 47 * * page 9, line 29 - line 35 * * page 10, line 11 - line 16 *; | [PX]WO9411406 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - E. GIANNETTI ET AL., "HOMOGENEOUS ZIEGLER NATTA CATALYSIS. II. ETHYLENE POLYMERI- ZATION BY IVB TRANSITION METAL COMPLEXES/ METHYL ALUMINOXANE CATALYST SYSTEMS", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, NEW YORK US, vol. 23, no. 8, pages 2117 - 2134 [A] 1 * EXPERIMENTAL; MATERIALS *; page 2118, paragraph 3 - page 2119, paragraph 3 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 01, Database accession no. 87-003779, & JPS61264035 A 19861121 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER) [X] 6,10 * abstract * |