EP0756791 - DATA TRANSMISSION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marconi Communications Limited New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states MARCONI COMMUNICATIONS LIMITED New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | ||
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states GPT LIMITED New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORWARD, Richard, Munro 39 Morningside, Earlsdon Coventry CV5 6PD / GB | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Burrington, Alan Graham Headford GEC Patent Department, Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Burrington, Alan GEC Patent Department, Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95915257.0 | 13.04.1995 | [1997/06] | WO1995GB00846 | Priority number, date | GB19940007817 | 20.04.1994 Original published format: GB 9407817 | GB19940020938 | 17.10.1994 Original published format: GB 9420938 | [1997/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9529548 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0756791 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0756791 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
H04L41/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, SE [1997/06] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSNETZ | [1997/06] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION NETWORK | [1997/06] | French: | RESEAU DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES | [1997/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 18.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 12.09.2002 | [2003/45] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8401070 (WESTERN ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 4 - page 3, line 8 * * page 5, line 28 - line 37 * * figures 1,6 *; | [A]EP0180990 (SPACELABS, INC.) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |