EP0757993 - PREVENTIVE FOR CIRCULATORY DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEBO LTD. 17-4, Sumida 5 chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-0031 / JP | [2003/25] |
Former [1997/07] | For all designated states KANEBO LTD. 17-4, Sumida 5 chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAI, Ryuji, Kanebo, Ltd. Biochemical Lab. 3-28, Kotobukicho 5-chome Odawara-shi, Kanagawa 250 / JP | 02 /
MURAKAMI, Umeji, Kanebo, Ltd. Biochemical Lab. 3-28, Kotobukicho 5-chome Odawara-shi, Kanagawa 250 / JP | 03 /
YAMORI, Yukio 43-7, Okazakiminamigoshocho, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606 / JP | [1997/07] | Representative(s) | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95915336.2 | 18.04.1995 | [1997/07] | WO1995JP00750 | Priority number, date | JP19940104480 | 19.04.1994 Original published format: JP 10448094 | [1997/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9528425 | Date: | 26.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0757993 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757993 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.10.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C07K1/12, A61K38/02 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
A61K38/018 (EP,US);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/4732 (EP,US);
C12P21/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1997/07] | Title | German: | FÜR KREISLAUFERKRANKUNGEN VORBEUGENDES MITTEL | [2002/49] | English: | PREVENTIVE FOR CIRCULATORY DISEASES | [1997/07] | French: | MEDICAMENT PREVENTIF DES MALADIES CIRCULATOIRES | [1997/07] |
Former [1997/07] | VORBEUGUNG VON KREISLAUFERKRANKUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.1996 | Translation filed | 07.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 07.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 08.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1171052 (HISSINK LOUIS ANNE GERHARD [AU]) [X] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X] - SUZUKI, TSUNEYUKI ET AL, "Hypotensive effects of peptide substances separated from different protein sources in foods given SHRSP and SHR", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19790716), vol. 91, no. 3, Database accession no. 18742, XP002073276 [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [ ] - ACTA MED. KINKI UNIV. (1978), 3(1), 11-18 | [X] - KARAKI H ET AL, "ANTIHYPERTENSIVE EFFECT OF TRYPTIC HYDROLYSATE OF MILK CASEIN IN SPONTANEOUSLY HYPERTENSIVE RATS.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, XP002073277 [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [ ] - COMP BIOCHEM PHYSIOL C COMP PHARMACOL TOXICOL 96 (2). 1990. 367-372 | International search | [X]JPS58109425 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN); | [X]JPS62270533 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al); | [X]JPS645497 (KANEBO LTD); | [X]JPH04341193 (KANEBO LTD); | [PX]JPH06211690 (KANEBO LTD) | Examination | US4462990 |