EP0758910 - Protective device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/09] | PROTECTIVE DEVICE | ||
[2001/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOBLE HOUSE GROUP PTY. LTD. Unit 6, 41-45 Tennant Street Fyshwick, ACT 2609 / AU | [2002/42] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states NOBLE HOUSE GROUP PTY. LTD. 7 Spensley Place Wanniassa, ACT 2903 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DILLON, Jagmohanbir, Singh 16 Dashwood Retreat Bonython, ACT 2905 / AU | 02 /
MOBBS, William, Leonard 7 Spensley Place Wanniassa, ACT 2903 / AU | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyers Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95915695.1 | 20.04.1995 | [1997/09] | WO1995AU00224 | Priority number, date | AU1994PM05206 | 20.04.1994 Original published format: AU PM520694 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9528979 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758910 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758910 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.11.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/158, A61M25/06 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
A61M25/0631 (EP,US);
A61M5/3243 (EP,US);
Y10S128/919 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/09] | A61M5/158 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/09] | Title | German: | Schutzvorrichtung | [2001/37] | English: | Protective device | [2001/37] | French: | Dispositif de protection | [2001/37] |
Former [1997/09] | SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [1997/09] | PROTECTIVE DEVICE | ||
Former [1997/09] | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 15.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 15.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.10.2002 | CH | 23.10.2002 | GR | 23.10.2002 | LI | 23.10.2002 | DK | 23.01.2003 | PT | 23.01.2003 | LU | 20.04.2003 | IE | 21.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
CH | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LI | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
LU | 20.04.2003 | ||
IE | 21.04.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
CH | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LI | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
LU | 20.04.2003 | ||
IE | 21.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
CH | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LI | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
IE | 21.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
CH | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LI | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 23.10.2002 | |
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 23.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5135505 (KAUFMAN JERRY M [US]) [X] 1-6,9 * column 5, line 26 - column 8, line 47 * * figures 1-14 *; | [X]WO9405205 (ICU MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 6, line 6 - page 9, line 26 ** figures 1-9 * | International search | [A]EP0475857 (HOSPAL IND [FR]); | [X]WO9204073 (ADVANCED PROTECTIVE INJECTION [NL]); | [X]WO9204063 (GIANAKOS ARTHUR [US]); | [A]US5147327 (JOHNSON GERALD W [US]); | [AP]AU5477594 (GRANT GRAHAM CAMERON) |