EP0756661 - LATCH WITH VARIABLE LOCK INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMKA BESCHLAGTEILE GmbH & Co. KG Langenberger Strasse 32 D-42551 Velbert / DE | [1997/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUNGE, Friedhelm Unterkohlfurth 23 D-42349 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
SAUERLAND, Manfred Pützstrasse 4 D-45144 Essen / DE | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Müller, Karl-Ernst, Dr., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [1997/06] | Müller, Karl-Ernst, Dr., Dipl.-Ing., et al Eisenhüttenstrasse 2 40882 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95915804.9 | 14.04.1995 | [1997/06] | WO1995DE00541 | Priority number, date | DE19944413771 | 20.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4413771 | [1997/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9529314 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0756661 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0756661 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E05B13/10, E05B13/00, E05B9/08 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
E05B63/0056 (EP,US);
E05B1/0092 (EP,US);
E05B13/002 (EP,US);
E05B13/10 (EP,US);
E05B17/186 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5761 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/06] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSS MIT VARIABLEM SCHLOSSEINSATZ | [1997/06] | English: | LATCH WITH VARIABLE LOCK INSERT | [1997/06] | French: | SYSTEME DE FERMETURE A SERRURE INTERIEURE VARIABLE | [1997/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 27.06.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]DE9406586U (EMKA BESCHLAGTEILE [DE]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5233851 (FLORIAN DAVID W [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,9 * column W *; | [DY]EP0054225 (RAMSAUER DIETER) [DY] 1,2,5,9 * the whole document *; | [DY]DE4210588 (EMKA BESCHLAGTEILE [DE]) [DY] 1,3,5,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0261266 (RAMSAUER DIETER) [A] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9012372U (EMKA BESCHLAGTEILE GMBH & CO. KG) [A] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8406483U (RITTAL-WERK RUDOLF LOH GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2152577 (LORI CORP) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3707313 (NIEDERDRENK JULIUS KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - "Reversible IC cabinet lock switches to drawer lock", LOCKSMITH LEDGER INTERNATIONAL, PARK RIDGE, IL, US, (199007), vol. 50, no. 9, pages 144 - 145 [A] 1 * the whole document * |