EP0707092 - SLIDE MEMBER AND METHOD OF ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Riken 13-5, Kudan-Kita 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA RIKEN 13-5, Kudan-Kita 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OOYA, Masaki 9-42, Seki-machi Kashiwazaki-shi Niigata-ken 945 / JP | 02 /
TAKIGUCHI, Katsumi 1-375, Uetake-cho Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken 330 / JP | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Serjeant, Andrew Charles 25 The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | [1996/16] | Application number, filing date | 95916023.5 | 20.04.1995 | [1996/16] | WO1995JP00782 | Priority number, date | JP19940104993 | 21.04.1994 Original published format: JP 10499394 | [1996/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9529271 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707092 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707092 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.11.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/06 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
C23C14/028 (EP);
C23C14/0641 (EP);
C23C14/58 (EP);
C23C14/5886 (EP);
C23C8/36 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1996/16] | Title | German: | GLEITSTÜCK UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1996/16] | English: | SLIDE MEMBER AND METHOD OF ITS PRODUCTION | [1996/16] | French: | COULISSE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1996/16] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1995 | Translation filed | 26.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1995 | Search fee paid | 26.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5205188 (REPENNING DETLEF [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 34 - line 66 *; | [A]GB2243162 (RIKEN KK [JP]) [A] 1-7 * page 4, line 2 - line 22 *; | [A] - STEFFENS H -D ET AL, "Reduction of droplet emission in random arc technology", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, 30 MAY 1991, SWITZERLAND, ISSN 0257-8972, vol. 46, no. 1, pages 65 - 74, XP002001774 [A] 1-7 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0257-8972(91)90150-U | International search | [X]JPS62120471 (RIKEN KK); | [X]JPH03172504 (RIKEN KK); | [X]JPS61107403U ; | [Y]JPH01234559 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0693421 (MASUMOTO TAKESHI, et al); | [A]JPS6287423 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) |