EP0755412 - FUEL OR LUBRICANT ADDITIVES, METHOD OF PRODUCING THEM AND FUEL OR LUBRICANT COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1997/05] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OPPENLÄNDER, Knut Otto-Dill-Strasse 23 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
MOHR, Jürgen Hochgewanne 48 D-67269 Grünstadt / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Hans-Joachim Pfortmüllerstrasse 52 D-67269 Grünstadt / DE | 04 /
POSSELT, Dietmar Kranichstrasse 11 D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
GÜNTHER, Wolfgang Hauptstrasse 9 D-67582 Mettenheim / DE | [1997/05] | Application number, filing date | 95916608.3 | 05.04.1995 | [1997/05] | WO1995EP01249 | Priority number, date | DE19944412489 | 12.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4412489 | [1997/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9527738 | Date: | 19.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755412 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755412 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00, C08F8/30, C08F8/34, C08F8/28, C10L1/18, C10L1/22, C10M143/00 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
C10M159/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08F210/16 (KR);
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/30 (EP,US);
C08F8/32 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/143 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/1817 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/198 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/221 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/238 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/2475 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/2493 (EP,KR,US);
C10L10/04 (EP,US);
C10L10/06 (EP,US);
C10M129/24 (EP,US);
C10M129/72 (EP,US);
C10M129/86 (EP,KR,US);
C10M133/08 (EP,US);
C10M133/16 (EP,US);
C10M133/44 (EP,US);
C10M133/50 (EP,US);
C10M133/52 (EP,US);
C10M133/58 (EP,KR,US);
C10M135/00 (EP,US);
C10M143/00 (EP,US);
C10M143/06 (EP,US);
C10L1/182 (EP,US);
C10L1/1852 (EP,US);
C10L1/1857 (EP,US);
C10L1/188 (EP,US);
C10L1/19 (EP,US);
C10L1/1905 (EP,US);
C10L1/191 (EP,US);
C10L1/1985 (EP,US);
C10L1/2222 (EP,US);
C10L1/2225 (EP,US);
C10L1/223 (EP,US);
C10L1/2235 (EP,US);
C10L1/224 (EP,US);
C10L1/2283 (EP,US);
C10L1/2286 (EP,US);
C10L1/232 (EP,US);
C10L1/2335 (EP,US);
C10L1/2383 (EP,US);
C10L1/2406 (EP,US);
C10L1/2425 (EP,US);
C10M2205/00 (EP,US);
C10M2205/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2205/026 (EP,US);
C10M2207/08 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/282 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/285 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/286 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/34 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/08 (EP,US);
C10M2215/082 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/086 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/12 (EP,US);
C10M2215/122 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/223 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/30 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2227/00 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/251 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F10/10 (EP,US);
C08F8/30, C08F10/10 (US,EP);
C08F8/32, C08F10/10 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/05] | Title | German: | KRAFT- ODER SCHMIERSTOFFADDITIVE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG SOWIE KRAFT- ODER SCHMIERSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, ENTHALTEND DIESE ADDITIVE | [1997/05] | English: | FUEL OR LUBRICANT ADDITIVES, METHOD OF PRODUCING THEM AND FUEL OR LUBRICANT COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE ADDITIVES | [1997/05] | French: | ADDITIFS POUR CARBURANTS ET LUBRIFIANTS, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION, ET COMPOSITIONS DE CARBURANTS OU DE LUBRIFIANTS CONTENANT CES ADDITIFS | [1997/05] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 09.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1489559 (CHEVRON RES) [A] 1,6-8 * page 2 * * page 9 *; | [DA]DE3611230 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1,2,6-8 * page 7, line 16 - line 29; claims 1-9 *; | [A]US4772406 (BROIS STANLEY J [US]) [A] 1,2,6-8 * column 6, line 23 - column 9, line 68 * * column 12, line 24 - column 15, line 20; claims 1-55 *; | [DA]EP0342792 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [DA] 1,5* page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 28; claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP0400844 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1,5 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 30; claims 1-11 *; | [PX]WO9413711 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-4,6-8 * page 10, line 2 - page 11, line 15 * * page 17, line 1 - page 18, line 14; claims 1-14 * |