EP0702810 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTERACTIVE DIALOGUE BETWEEN A USER AND A TELEMATIC SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metalogic 3, rue Clément-Marot 75008 Paris / FR | [1999/50] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states Metalogic 3, rue CLément-Marot F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORGAINE, Sylvain 6, rue Bourbon-le-Château F-75006 Paris / FR | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Benech, Frédéric, et al Cabinet Benech 15, rue d'Astorg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Benech, Frédéric, et al 69, Avenue Victor Hugo F-75783 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95917385.7 | 12.04.1995 | [1996/13] | WO1995FR00476 | Priority number, date | FR19940004329 | 12.04.1994 Original published format: FR 9404329 | [1996/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9527934 | Date: | 19.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702810 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702810 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/023 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
G06F3/0489 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1996/13] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM INTERAKTIVEN DIALOG ZWISCHEN EINEM BENUTZER UND EINEM TELEMATISCHEN SERVER | [1996/13] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTERACTIVE DIALOGUE BETWEEN A USER AND A TELEMATIC SERVER | [1996/13] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DIALOGUE INTERACTIF ENTRE UN UTILISATEUR ET UN SERVEUR TELEMATIQUE | [1996/13] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 16.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO8905023 (FERNANDEZ EMILIO A [US]) [YD] 1-3,5-10 * page 7, line 7 - page 11, line 17; figures 1-3; claims 1,4-6 *; | [Y]EP0326751 (SPERRY MARINE INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-10 * page 2, column 2, line 44 - page 3, column 3, line 23; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE4113542 (WEISE GUSTAV [DE]) [Y] 6,9* the whole document *; | [Y]WO9310605 (LAPPINGTON JOHN P [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-10 * page 8, line 27 - page 14, line 34 * * page 21, line 5 - page 24, line 9; figures 1,6 * |