EP0758927 - A PUMP MADE OF PLASTIC FOR DISPENSING PRODUCTS FROM CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAPLAST SRL Strada Marosticana 65/67, Povolaro 36031 Dueville / IT | [1997/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTAGIULIANA, Evans Via O. Da Pordenone, 13 I-36100 Vincenza / IT | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Bonini, Ercole Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Bonini, Ercole c/o STUDIO ING. E. BONINI SRL Corso Fogazzaro 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 95917459.0 | 11.03.1996 | [1997/09] | WO1996IB00391 | Priority number, date | IT1995VI00037 | 10.03.1995 Original published format: IT VI950037 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9628257 | Date: | 19.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758927 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
B05B11/0005 (EP);
B05B11/1001 (EP);
B05B11/1054 (EP);
B05B11/1066 (EP);
B05B11/1074 (EP);
B05B11/1077 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/09] | Title | German: | PUMPE AUS KUNSTSTOFF ZUM SPENDEN VON PRODUKTEN AUS BEHÄLTERN | [1997/09] | English: | A PUMP MADE OF PLASTIC FOR DISPENSING PRODUCTS FROM CONTAINERS | [1997/09] | French: | POMPE EN PLASTIQUE POUR DISTRIBUER DES PRODUITS A PARTIR DE RECIPIENTS | [1997/09] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 09.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.06.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2380077 (NORMOS NORBERT [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]WO9408889 (RESEAL INT LP [US]) [A] 1 * page 9, paragraph 1; figures 3,4 *; | [X]WO9420221 (TAPLAST SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * |