EP0762895 - SYNTHETIC VACCINE FOR PROTECTION AGAINST HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LU | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University 230 North Building, Research Drive, Box 90083 Durham North Carolina 27708-0083 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states DUKE UNIVERSITY 230 North Building, Research Drive, Box 90083 Durham, North Carolina 27708-0083 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYNES, Barton F. 4923 Wentworth Drive Durham, NC 27707 / US | 02 /
PALKER, Thomas J. 116 Stedwick Place Durham, NC 27712 / US | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95917797.3 | 28.04.1995 | [1997/12] | WO1995US05465 | Priority number, date | US19940235305 | 29.04.1994 Original published format: US 235305 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9529700 | Date: | 09.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0762895 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0762895 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.11.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/21, C07K14/155, C07K17/02, C07K19/00 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/12] | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHER IMPFSTOFF ZUM SCHUTZ GEGEN INFEKTIONEN MIT DEM MENSCHLICHEN IMMUNSCHWÄCHEVIRUS | [1997/12] | English: | SYNTHETIC VACCINE FOR PROTECTION AGAINST HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS INFECTION | [1997/12] | French: | VACCIN DE SYNTHESE PROTEGEANT CONTRE L'INFECTION PAR LE VIH | [1997/12] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 21.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 02.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31] | Request for further processing for: | 05.04.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.04.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 30.04.2003 | [2015/21] |
Former [2007/16] | LU | 30.04.2003 | |
MC | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | MC | 30.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5013548 (HAYNES BARTON F [US], et al); | [X]US5019387 (HAYNES BARTON F [US], et al) |