EP0760626 - Orthopaedic apparatus for controlled contraction of soft tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/11] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLED CONTRACTION OF SOFT TISSUE | ||
[2000/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oratec Interventions, Inc. 3700 Haven Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAX, Ronald, G. P.O. Box 2796 Grass Valley, CA 95945 / US | 02 /
FANTON, Gary, S. 265 Golden Oak Drive Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | 03 /
EDWARDS, Stuart, D. 1681 Austin Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al c/o D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95918355.9 | 05.05.1995 | [1997/11] | WO1995US05432 | Priority number, date | US19940238862 | 06.05.1994 Original published format: US 238862 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9530373 | Date: | 16.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760626 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760626 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/56, A61F7/12 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
A61B18/148 (EP,US);
A61N1/40 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00023 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00083 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00452 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/143 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1472 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | Orthopädische Vorrichtung zur kontrollierten Kontraktion von weichem Gewebe | [2000/40] | English: | Orthopaedic apparatus for controlled contraction of soft tissue | [2001/39] | French: | Appareil orthopédique permettant la contraction contrôlée des tissus mous | [2000/40] |
Former [1997/11] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTROLLIERTEN KONTRAKTION VON WEICHEM GEWEBE | ||
Former [1997/11] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLED CONTRACTION OF SOFT TISSUE | ||
Former [1997/11] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT LA CONTRACTION CONTROLEE DES TISSUS MOUS | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 23.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.1999 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Request for further processing for: | 09.04.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.09.2001 | BE | 26.09.2001 | CH | 26.09.2001 | LI | 26.09.2001 | NL | 26.09.2001 | DK | 26.12.2001 | PT | 26.12.2001 | SE | 26.12.2001 | GR | 28.12.2001 | ES | 26.03.2002 | LU | 05.05.2002 | MC | 05.05.2002 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 26.09.2001 | |
BE | 26.09.2001 | ||
CH | 26.09.2001 | ||
LI | 26.09.2001 | ||
NL | 26.09.2001 | ||
DK | 26.12.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
SE | 26.12.2001 | ||
ES | 26.03.2002 | ||
LU | 05.05.2002 | ||
MC | 05.05.2002 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 26.09.2001 | |
BE | 26.09.2001 | ||
CH | 26.09.2001 | ||
LI | 26.09.2001 | ||
NL | 26.09.2001 | ||
DK | 26.12.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
SE | 26.12.2001 | ||
ES | 26.03.2002 | ||
MC | 05.05.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 26.09.2001 | |
BE | 26.09.2001 | ||
CH | 26.09.2001 | ||
LI | 26.09.2001 | ||
NL | 26.09.2001 | ||
DK | 26.12.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
ES | 26.03.2002 | ||
MC | 05.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 26.09.2001 | |
BE | 26.09.2001 | ||
CH | 26.09.2001 | ||
LI | 26.09.2001 | ||
NL | 26.09.2001 | ||
DK | 26.12.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
MC | 05.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 26.09.2001 | |
BE | 26.09.2001 | ||
CH | 26.09.2001 | ||
LI | 26.09.2001 | ||
NL | 26.09.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
MC | 05.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 26.09.2001 | |
BE | 26.09.2001 | ||
CH | 26.09.2001 | ||
LI | 26.09.2001 | ||
NL | 26.09.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | BE | 26.09.2001 | |
CH | 26.09.2001 | ||
LI | 26.09.2001 | ||
NL | 26.09.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | BE | 26.09.2001 | |
CH | 26.09.2001 | ||
LI | 26.09.2001 | ||
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | BE | 26.09.2001 | |
PT | 26.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | BE | 26.09.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4976709 (SAND BRUCE J [US]) [A] 1,23,25,48,51,54; | [A]EP0479482 (MEGADYNE MED PROD INC [US]) [A] 1,23,25,48,51,54; | [A]WO9301774 (BOECKMANN ALFRED [DE])[A] 1,23,25,48,51,54; | [A]US5213097 (ZEINDLER KURT [CH]) [A] 1,23,25,48,51,54 | Examination | US4326529 | US5257990 | WO9426189 |