EP0759134 - CLOSURE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CLOSING DUCTS WHICH CONVEY PRESSURE MEDIUM IN A HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/09] | CLOSURE DEVICE FOR CLOSING DUCTS WHICH CONVEY PRESSURE MEDIUM IN A HOUSING | ||
[1999/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [1999/04] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOGEL, Günther Buchschlager Allee 11 D-63303 Dreieich / DE | 02 /
VOLZ, Peter In den Wingerten 14 D-64291 Darmstadt / DE | [1997/09] | Application number, filing date | 95918591.9 | 22.04.1995 | [1997/09] | WO1995EP01532 | Priority number, date | DE19944415341 | 02.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4415341 | [1997/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9530108 | Date: | 09.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759134 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759134 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/11, F16B4/00 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
B23P11/00 (EP,US);
F16B4/004 (EP,US);
F16L55/11 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49938 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/09] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN VON DRUCKMITTEL FÜHRENDEN KANÄLEN IN EINEM GEHÄUSE | [1999/16] | English: | CLOSURE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CLOSING DUCTS WHICH CONVEY PRESSURE MEDIUM IN A HOUSING | [1999/16] | French: | SYSTEME D'OBTURATION ET PROCEDE POUR OBTURER DES CONDUITES DE FLUIDES SOUS PRESSION DANS UN BOITIER | [1999/16] |
Former [1997/09] | VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN VON DRUCKMITTEL FÜHRENDEN KANÄLEN IN EINEM GEHÄUSE | ||
Former [1997/09] | CLOSURE DEVICE FOR CLOSING DUCTS WHICH CONVEY PRESSURE MEDIUM IN A HOUSING | ||
Former [1997/09] | SYSTEME DE FERMETURE POUR OBTURER DES CONDUITES D'ACHEMINEMENT DE SUBSTANCES SOUS PRESSION DANS UN BOITIER | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3387735 (DE MARCO ROBERT F) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 28 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-7 *; | [DA]DE8716060U (ROBERT BOSCHE GMBH) [DA] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE538132 (BOSCH ROBERT AG) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US1929824 (POLLEY FRANK G) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 40 - line 71; figures 3-5 *; | [A]WO9110071 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 6; figure - *; | [A]US2138404 (HAAS WALTER D) [A] 1,5 * column W *; | [A]EP0411215 (FUJI VALVE [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 25 - column 6, line 19; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US4726401 (NAGANO SHUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * column W * |