EP0758374 - HETEROGENEOUS SURFACE-ACTIVE GRANULATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [1997/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISCHKEL, Ditmar Schwanenstrasse 20 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
SCHMID, Karl Stifterstrasse 10 D-40822 Mettmann / DE | 03 /
SYLDATH, Andreas Am Nettchesfeld 25 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
KROHNEN, Thomas Henkelstrasse 238 D-40599 Düsseldorf / DE | [1997/08] | Application number, filing date | 95918598.4 | 24.04.1995 | [1997/08] | WO1995EP01544 | Priority number, date | DE19944415369 | 02.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4415369 | [1997/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9529981 | Date: | 09.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758374 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758374 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D1/37 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
C11D1/146 (EP,US);
C11D1/37 (EP,US);
C11D11/0082 (EP,US);
C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
C11D1/14 (EP,US);
C11D1/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/08] | Title | German: | HETEROGENE TENSIDGRANULATE | [1997/08] | English: | HETEROGENEOUS SURFACE-ACTIVE GRANULATES | [1997/08] | French: | GRANULES DE TENSIOACTIF HETEROGENES | [1997/08] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/08] | 10.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0342917 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 37 - line 45; claims 1-6 *; | [A]WO9315180 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 8 - page 9; claims 1,2,27,28 *; | [PA]DE4242185 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [PA] 1,2 * page 2, line 36 - page 4, line 5; claims 1-5,10,13 *; | [PA]WO9502390 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PA] 1,2 * page 1 - page 6 * * page 27 - page 28; examples 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [PA]WO9508616 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [PA] 1,2* page 5 - page 9; claims 1,7,8,18,19 * |