EP0707741 - SURFACE MOUNT AND FLIP CHIP TECHNOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SILICONIX Incorporated 2201 Laurelwood Road, M/S 12 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states SILICONIX INCORPORATED 2201 Laurelwood Road, M/S 12 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Mike, F. 10343 S. Blaney Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
OWYANG, King 66 Encina Avenue Atherton, CA 94026 / US | 03 /
HSHIEH, Fwu-Iuan 20768 Sevilla Lane Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 04 /
HO, Yueh-Se 735 Iris Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 05 /
DUN, Jowei 3171 Mabury Road San Jose, CA 95127 / US | 06 /
FÜSSER, Hans-Jürgen Querstrasse 2, Baden-Würtemberg, Heidenheim D-89547 Gerstetten-Dettingen / DE | 07 /
ZACHAI, Reinhard Kappenzipfel 9 1/2 D-89312 Günzburg / DE | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [1996/17] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95918863.2 | 04.05.1995 | [1996/17] | WO1995US05217 | Priority number, date | US19940238552 | 05.05.1994 Original published format: US 238552 | US19940321937 | 12.10.1994 Original published format: US 321937 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9531006 | Date: | 16.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707741 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/48, H01L21/76, H01L23/373, H01L23/367 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
H01L24/10 (EP);
H01L23/29 (EP);
H01L23/3672 (EP);
H01L23/3732 (EP);
H01L23/3738 (EP);
H01L23/481 (EP);
H01L24/13 (EP);
H01L2224/13 (EP);
H01L2224/13099 (EP);
H01L2224/16 (EP);
H01L2224/73253 (EP);
H01L2924/01006 (EP);
H01L2924/01013 (EP);
H01L2924/01015 (EP);
H01L2924/01029 (EP);
H01L2924/01033 (EP);
H01L2924/01042 (EP);
H01L2924/01047 (EP);
H01L2924/01074 (EP);
H01L2924/01078 (EP);
H01L2924/01079 (EP);
H01L2924/01082 (EP);
H01L2924/014 (EP);
H01L2924/1305 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/13, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/1306, H01L2924/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/17] | H01L23/48, H01L21/76 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1996/17] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENMONTAGE UND FLIP-CHIP-TECHNOLOGIE | [2001/09] | English: | SURFACE MOUNT AND FLIP CHIP TECHNOLOGY | [1996/17] | French: | MONTAGE EN SURFACE ET TECHNOLOGIE DE PUCE A PROTUBERANCES | [2001/09] |
Former [1996/17] | OBERFLÄCHENMONTAGE UND FLIP-CHIP-TECHNOLOGIE | ||
Former [1996/17] | MONTAGE EN SURFACE ET TECHNOLOGIE DE PUCE A PROTUBERANCES | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.1996 | Search fee paid | 02.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 04.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/32] | 12.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PY]EP0637078 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [PY] 1,8,16 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS62154651 ; | [A]EP0317124 (CRYSTALLUME [US]) [A] 1,8,16 * figure 3 *; | [A]US4764804 (SAHARA KUNIZO [JP], et al) [A] 1,16 * figure 2 *; | [A]JPH01120853 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871219), vol. 011, no. 390, Database accession no. (E - 567), & JP62154651 A 19870709 (NIPPON SOKEN INC) [Y] 1,8,16 * abstract * | [A] - SODERBARG A ET AL, "FORMATION OF HEAT SINKS USING BONDING AND ETCH BACK TECHNIQUE IN COMBINATION WITH DIAMOND DEPOSITION", EXTENDED ABSTRACTS, (19930101), vol. 93/1, page 1239, XP000432666 [A] 1,8,16 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890814), vol. 013, no. 364, Database accession no. (E - 805), & JP01120853 A 19890512 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,16 * abstract * | International search | [YE]US5426072 (FINNILA RONALD M [US]); | [Y]US5272104 (SCHRANTZ GREGORY A [US], et al); | [Y]US5229643 (OHTA HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5170930 (DOLBEAR THOMAS P [US], et al); | [Y]US5091331 (DELGADO JOSE A [US], et al); | [Y]US4972250 (OMORI MASAHIRO [US], et al) |