EP0754150 - CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER, CONSISTING OF A CLOSURE UNDERPART AND A SCREW CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IE | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heinrich Stolz GmbH & Co KG In der Au 13 D-57290 Neunkirchen / DE | [1997/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOLZ, Bernd Am Porzheain 30 D-57290 Neunkirchen / DE | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Jeck, Fleck & partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro A. Jeck & H.-J. Fleck Markgröninger Strasse 47/1 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95919338.4 | 07.04.1995 | [1997/04] | WO1995EP01292 | Priority number, date | DE19944412195 | 08.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4412195 | DE19940020952U | 31.12.1994 Original published format: DE 9420952 U | DE19952001185U | 26.01.1995 Original published format: DE 29501185 U | [1997/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9527663 | Date: | 19.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754150 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0754150 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/06, B65D47/12 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
B65D47/123 (EP,US);
B65D47/063 (EP,US);
B65D50/046 (EP,US);
B65D2215/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/04] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSS FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER AUS EINEM VERSCHLUSSUNTERTEIL UND EINER SCHRAUBKAPPE | [1997/04] | English: | CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER, CONSISTING OF A CLOSURE UNDERPART AND A SCREW CAP | [1997/04] | French: | FERMETURE DESTINEE A UN RECIPIENT, COMPOSEE D'UNE PARTIE INFERIEURE ET D'UN BOUCHON FILETE | [1997/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 11.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 27.08.1997 | SE | 27.11.1997 | AT | 07.04.1998 | LU | 07.04.1998 | [2004/39] |
Former [2000/21] | GR | 27.08.1997 | |
IE | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
AT | 07.04.1998 | ||
LU | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 27.08.1997 | |
IE | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
LU | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | IE | 27.08.1997 | |
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | SE | 27.11.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3625477 (FRIEDHOFF & MUELLER FM PLAST [DE]) [A] 1,4,6 * column 2, line 29 - line 58; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0264152 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 46 - line 53; figures 1-12 *; | [A]DE4139896 (BLECHWARENFABRIK LIMBURG GMBH); | [AD]DE4209784 (STOLZ HEINRICH GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1-2 * |