EP0755442 - LIPASES WITH IMPROVED SURFACTANT RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2001/42] |
Former [1997/05] | For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC. 4 Cambridge Place, 1870 Winton Road South Rochester, New York 14618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AEHLE, Wolfgang Lumumbasingel 7 NL-2622 ED Delft / NL | 02 /
GERRITSE, Gijsbert De Hoef 38 NL-2995 VT Heerjansdam / NL | 03 /
LENTING, Hermanus, Bernardus, Maria Hunze 5 NL-2641 VT Pijnacker / NL | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95919388.9 | 28.04.1995 | [1997/05] | WO1995EP01687 | Priority number, date | EP19940201253 | 04.05.1994 Original published format: EP 94201253 | [1997/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9530744 | Date: | 16.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755442 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755442 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/20, C11D3/386 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
C12N9/20 (EP,US);
C11D3/38627 (EP,US);
Y10S435/874 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/05] | Title | German: | LIPASEN MIT VERBESSERTEN TENSIOSTABILITAET | [1997/05] | English: | LIPASES WITH IMPROVED SURFACTANT RESISTANCE | [1997/05] | French: | LIPASES A RESISTANCE AUX TENSIOACTIFS AMELIOREE | [1997/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 27.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.10.2002 | ES | 29.04.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/04] | ES | 29.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0525610 (SOLVAY ENZYMES GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,14-17,19-21 * page 2, line 43 - line 46; figure 3; claims 1-4,7,8 * [Y] 8-10,18; | [XY]WO9402617 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,11-17,19-21 * the whole document * [Y] 8-10,18; | [XY]EP0218272 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [X] 1-7,11-17,19-21 * the whole document * [Y] 8-10,18; | [XY]EP0407225 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,11-17,19-21 * the whole document * [Y] 8-10,18; | [Y]EP0334462 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [Y] 18 * example 6 *; | [PX]WO9425577 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1-9,14-17,19-21 * claims 1-3,15 * | [DA] - KELLIS T.K. ET AL., "cONTRIBUTION OF HYDROPHOBIC INTERACTIONS TO PROTEIN STABILITY", NATURE, LONDON, vol. 333, pages 784 - 786 [DA] 1-9,14-17,19-21 * the whole document * |