EP0717875 - X-RAY EXAMINATION APPARATUS COMPRISING A FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [1998/42] | For:DE
FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/26] | For:DE
FR
GB
NL
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDERS, Petrus, Wilhelmus, Johannes Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BÖHMER, Marcel, René Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
SEVERENS, Michael, Johannes, Maria, Jozef Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Cohen, Julius Simon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Cohen, Julius Simon International Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 95919621.3 | 15.06.1995 | [1996/26] | WO1995IB00486 | Priority number, date | EP19940201884 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: EP 94201884 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9600967 | Date: | 11.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0717875 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0717875 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G21K3/00, A61B6/00, A61N5/10 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
G21K1/10 (EP,US);
H05G1/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/26] | G21K3/00, A61B6/00, // A61N5/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/26] | Title | German: | MIT EINEM FILTER AUSGERÜSTETES RÖNTGENGERÄT | [1996/26] | English: | X-RAY EXAMINATION APPARATUS COMPRISING A FILTER | [1996/26] | French: | APPAREIL DE RADIOGRAPHIE AUX RAYONS X COMPRENANT UN FILTRE | [1996/26] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 13.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 14.10.1998 | [2003/08] | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2600204 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [Y]US4497062 (MISTRETTA CHARLES A [US], et al); | [A]US5281370 (ASHER SANFORD A [US], et al); | [A]JP5192317 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 17, No. 662, C-1130; & JP,A,5 192 317 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP), 3 August 1993 (03-08-93)., & JP5192317 A 19930803 |